ERHART v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-05103 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 31, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 06, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:19-cv-03081 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 28, 2020 5:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN ERHART
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (lsd) |
|
Thursday, October 01, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() ORDER. Plaintiffs' motions to remand are DENIED. All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs are now reinstated as to Plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/1/2020. (sdw) |
|
Tuesday, April 07, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() AFFIDAVIT in Support re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court Declaration of Vince C. Reuter filed by John Erhart. (REUTER, VINCE) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
18 | 18
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by John Erhart. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
17 | 17
![]() MOTION to Remand to State Court by John Erhart. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 04/08 8:06 AM
Set Deadlines as to17 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/21/2020) . (djb) |
||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by John Erhart. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of John Erhart (REAMS, JARED) |
|
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of John Erhart (REUTER, VINCE) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of John Erhart (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Short Form Complaints (Amended) due by 1/21/2020 .) (djb) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-03081. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-3081 (SRN/DTS). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2019.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |