Scott County, Missouri v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-46174 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 31, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Eastern, 1:19-cv-00207 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2020 4:32 PM EST |
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Warehouse #45
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #1
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SAJ Distributors
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc, f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McQueary Brothers Drug Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Scott County, Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/07/2020 4:31 PM EST |
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
***REMARK Phone conversation with Petitioner's attorney of record advising additional initial filing documents are needed in this case. (CMH) [Transferred from moed on 12/31/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 293 pgs COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7598120, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Scott County, Missouri.(Schnieders, Christopher) [Transferred from moed on 12/31/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. (CMH) [Transferred from moed on 12/31/2019.] | ||
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Scott County, Missouri.(Schnieders, Christopher) [Transferred from moed on 12/31/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 2 Waiver of Service AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, | ||
Att: 3 Waiver of Service Actavis LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Waiver of Service Actavis Pharma, Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Waiver of Service Allergan Finance LLC, | ||
Att: 6 Waiver of Service Allergan plc, | ||
Att: 7 Waiver of Service Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, | ||
Att: 8 Waiver of Service Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 9 Waiver of Service Cephalon, Inc., | ||
Att: 10 Waiver of Service Endo Health Solutions Inc., | ||
Att: 11 Waiver of Service Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 12 Waiver of Service Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Waiver of Service Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 14 Waiver of Service Johnson & Johnson, | ||
Att: 15 Waiver of Service McKesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 16 Waiver of Service McQueary Brothers Drug Company, LLC, | ||
Att: 17 Waiver of Service Noramco, Inc., | ||
Att: 18 Waiver of Service Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 19 Waiver of Service Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., | ||
Att: 20 Waiver of Service Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., | ||
Att: 21 Waiver of Service SAJ Distributors, | ||
Att: 22 Waiver of Service Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., | ||
Att: 23 Waiver of Service Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 24 Waiver of Service Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., | ||
Att: 25 Waiver of Service Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., | ||
Att: 26 Waiver of Service Walmart Inc., | ||
Att: 27 Waiver of Service Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse, | ||
Att: 28 Waiver of Service Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #1, | ||
Att: 29 Waiver of Service Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, | ||
Att: 30 Waiver of Service Wal-Mart Warehouse #45, | ||
Att: 31 Waiver of Service Watson Laboratories, Inc. | ||
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-126) regarding IN RE: IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel.(JWD) [Transferred from moed on 12/31/2019.] | |
4 | 4 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (JWD) [Transferred from moed on 12/31/2019.] | |
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 1:19-cv-00207. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |