Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-24696

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lashonda A Hunt
Case #: 1:19-ap-01060
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2019
Terminated:Aug 17, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Morgan Herron
1805 Henley St. Unit B
Glenview, IL 60025
Represented By
Morgan Herron
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Janus et al.
Represented By
Peter C. Nabhani
Law Office Of Peter C. Nabhani
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Werner
Represented By
Peter C. Nabhani
Law Office Of Peter C. Nabhani
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Thomas
Represented By
Peter C. Nabhani
Law Office Of Peter C. Nabhani
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, August 17, 2023
95 95 court Close Adversary Case Thu 08/17 9:33 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1060 Closed . (Roman, Felipe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
94 94 2 pgs order Approve Thu 08/17 7:49 AM
Agreed Order Granting Motion to Approve Related [+], Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. The trial date of 8/23/2023 is hereby stricken. Signed on 8/16/2023. (Roman, Felipe)
Related: [-] 92 92
93 93 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Wed 08/16 10:26 AM
Hearing Scheduled for 8/23/2023 Stricken Related [+]. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint