Maryland District Court
Judge:George Jarrod Hazel
Case #: 8:19-cv-03666
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2019
Terminated:Mar 11, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jun 27, 2020 6:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Charles County Government
Plaintiff
Todd A. Elliott
12 Lookout Drive
Indian Head, MD 20640


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, March 11, 2021
6 6 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 03/11 4:40 PM
ORDER DISMISSING Complaint without prejudice, directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 3/10/2021. (c/m 03/11/2021 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/14 11:17 AM
ORDER denying4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 1/13/2021. (c/m 1/14/2021 nus, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/12 9:20 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd A. Elliott(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Supplemental Tue 05/12 9:19 AM
Supplement to1 Complaint filed by Todd A. Elliott(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, April 13, 2020
2 2 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/13 11:17 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff 28 days from the date of this Order to file a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis or pay the full filing fee; granting Plaintiff 28 days from the date of this Order to file a supplement to the1 Complaint; forewarning Plaintiff that failure to comply with this Order in the time specified will result in dismissal of the Complaint without prejudice and without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 4/13/2020. (tds, Deputy Clerk) (c/m as directed 4/13/2020)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/31 12:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Charles County Government, filed by Todd A. Elliott. Related [+]
Related: [-] ceived on 12/31/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk
Att: 1 Envelope