Kentucky Western District Court
Case #: 3:20-mc-99999
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2020

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
1118 1118 misc Complaint Wed 12/30 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT . AMJAD SAID ALBAKRI vs HAITHAM SAID; DIVISIONAL OFFICE: LOUISVILLE DIVISION; ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0644-3254908). (Attested Copies:Y) (Butrum, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet
1117 1117 misc Complaint Wed 12/30 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT . Andrew Cederholm vs Waterfront Development Corporations, A Non-Profit Kentucky Corporation; DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Louisville; (Filing fee $402. ). (Attested Copies:N) (Tucker, Lee) Modified on 12/30/2020. New Case 3:20-cv-865-GNS; emailed lou-ECF (SRH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons
1116 1116 misc Notice of Removal Wed 12/30 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-006955. Renaissance/The Park, LLC d/b/a Renaissance Fun Park vs The Cincinnati Insurance Company; FEDERAL DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Louisville; (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0644-3254688). (Attested Copies:N) (Cook, Matthew) Modified on 12/30/2020. New Case 3:20-cv-864-RGJ; emailed lou-ECF (SRH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Emails re Service and Extension to File Responsive Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
1115 1115 misc Notice of Removal Tue 12/29 7:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-006311. Al J. Schneider Co. vs Hartford Fire Insurance Company; FEDERAL DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Louisville; ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0644-3254232). (Attested Copies:N) (O'Brien, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: State Court Record,
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Al J. Schneider Company Business Information,
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Schneider Waterfront, LLC, Business Information,
Att: 4 Exhibit D: Schoenberger Linkedin Page,
Att: 5 Exhibit E: Oetken Linkedin Page,
Att: 6 Exhibit F: E-mail from Counsel,
Att: 7 Exhibit G: Schneider Riverfront, LLC, Business Information,
Att: 8 Exhibit H: Schneider Parking, LLC, Business Information,
Att: 9 Exhibit I: Bankruptcy Plan,
Att: 10 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 11 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement of Hartford Fire Insurance Company
1114 1114 misc Notice of Removal Tue 12/29 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-006333. Phillip McCray vs Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.; FEDERAL DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Louisville; ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0644-3254186). (Attested Copies:N) (Burroughs, Rebecca) Modified on 12/29/2020 New Case 3:20-CV-862-DJH; emailed lou-ecf (DJT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Original Complaint,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet for Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement
1113 1113 misc Complaint Tue 12/29 12:25 PM
COMPLAINT . Tracy Bertram vs Equifax Information Services, LLC; DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Bowling Green; ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0644-3253782). (Attested Copies:N) (McKenzie, James) Modified on 12/29/2020 New Case 1:20-CV-214-GNS; emailed bg-ecf (DJT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mariner Check Loan,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Collection Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Motion for Default,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Default Judgment,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Amended Judgment,
Att: 6 Summons Tendered as to Equifax Information Services, LLC,
Att: 7 Summons Tendered as to Mariner Finance, LLC,
Att: 8 Summons Tendered as to Trans Union, LLC,
Att: 9 Cover Sheet
Monday, December 28, 2020
1112 1112 misc Notice of Removal Mon 12/28 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Henderson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00726. MARY ROSS vs MCKENZIE WILSON; FEDERAL DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Owensboro; ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0644-3253181). (Attested Copies:N) (Leckrone, Joshua) Modified on 12/28/2020 New Case 4:20-CV-210-JHM; emailed ow-ecf (DJT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Disclosure Statement,
Att: 4 Exhibit Answer and Cross-Claim
1111 1111 misc Notice of Removal Mon 12/28 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-006985. Jeffrey Shaffer vs Aramark Services, Inc.; ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0644-3253051). (Attested Copies:N) (Uhl, Judd) Modified on 12/28/2020 New Case 3:20-CV-858-GNS; emailed lou-ecf (DJT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal - State,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
1110 1110 misc Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/23 5:36 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS . ROBERT ALLEN GREENWELL vs COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY DIVISIONAL OFFICE: PADUCAH. (Attested Copies:N) (Thornton-Green, Donna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 3 Summons General Counsel,
Att: 4 Summons Civil Process Clerk,
Att: 5 Summons Attorney General,
Att: 6 Cover Sheet
1109 1109 misc Notice of Removal Wed 12/23 4:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marshall Circuit, case number 20-CI-293. Amy White vs Vladyslav Zhylaiev; FEDERAL DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Paducah; ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0644-3252100). (Attested Copies:N) (Barnes, David) Modified on 12/23/2020 New Case 5:20-CV-206-TBR; emailed pad-ecf (DJT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A. Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B. Owners Answer,
Att: 4 Exhibit C. DA IL Cert,
Att: 5 Exhibit D. Owners OH Cert,
Att: 6 Exhibit E. Dec Page,
Att: 7 Exhibit DA 7.1 Disclosure,
Att: 8 Exhibit Owners 7.1 Disclosure
1108 1108 misc Notice of Removal Wed 12/23 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-04496. Cecil Calhoun vs Louisville Metro Government; FEDERAL DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Louisville; (Filing fee $402.). (Attested Copies:N) (Ekman, Michael) Modified on 12/23/2020 New Case 3:20-CV-857-RGJ; emailed lou-ecf (DJT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-Amended Complaint
1107 1107 misc Complaint Wed 12/23 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT . Crystal Fox vs Board of Education of Mayfield Independent School District; DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Paducah; ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0644-3251637). (Attested Copies:N) (Sullenger, D.) Modified on 12/23/2020 New Case 5:20-CV-205-TBR; emailed pad-ecf (DJT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Board of Education of Mayfield Independent School District,
Att: 3 Summons Joe Henderson,
Att: 4 Summons Mountain Comprehensive Care Center, Inc.