Connecticut District Court
Case #: 3:14-cr-00065
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Mar 19, 2015 10:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Lisa Wilson-Foley (2)
Represented By
Craig A. Raabe
Robinson & Cole
contact info
Ryan McGuigan
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Nuala E. Droney
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Kathleen Elizabeth Dion
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael J. Gustafson
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
Liam Brennan
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
Christopher M. Mattei
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Hfd
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Brian Foley (1)
Terminated: 01/12/2015
Represented By
Hubert J. Santos
Law Offices Of Hubert J. Santos
contact info
Jessica M. Santos
Law Offices Of Hubert J. Santos
contact info

GPO Jan 07 2015
ORDER; Defendant Lisa Wilson-Foley's request in her Memorandum 51 in Aid of Sentencing for a hearing pursuant to United States v. Fatico, 603 F.2d 1053 (2d Cir. 1979) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/7/2015. (Morril, Gregory)

1. Former Conn. Gov. Sentenced to 30 Months in Prison (wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 03/19/2015
Docket last updated: 03/19/2015 10:56 AM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2014
1 1 INFORMATION as to Brian Foley (1) count 1, Lisa Wilson-Foley (2) count 1. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORAL MOTION for an application for release pending sentencing pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3143 by Brian Foley. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Oral Order granting 2 Oral Motion for an application for release pending sentencing pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3143 as to Brian Foley (1); Initial Appearance as to Brian Foley held on 3/31/2014; Change of Plea Hearing as to Brian Foley held on 3/31/2014; Motion Hearing as to Brian Foley held on 3/31/2014 re 2 filed by Brian Foley ; Bond Hearing as to Brian Foley held on 3/31/2014; Plea entered by Brian Foley (1) Guilty Count 1 information. Time 42 minutes(Court Reporter FTR.) (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
4 4 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Brian Foley (Wood, R.) (Wood, R.).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/1/2014) Cooperation Agreement
5 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO PROBATION FOR PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION AND REPORT as to Brian Foley. First Disclosure-PSI due 5/12/2014, Objections Due 5/26/2014, 2nd-Disclosure PSI due 6/5/2014, Sentencing Memorandum due 6/12/2014, Response due 6/17/2014, Sentencing set for 6/23/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom Three-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Warren W. Eginton. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 3/31/14. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
6 6 Consent Form as to Brian Foley to enter guilty plea before DFM (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
7 7 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Brian Foley Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 3/31/2014. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER as to Brian Foley - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/31/14. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORAL MOTION for an application for release pending sentencing pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3143 by Lisa Wilson-Foley. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Oral Order granting 9 Oral Motion for an application for release pending sentencing pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3143 as to Lisa Wilson-Foley (2); Initial Appearance as to Lisa Wilson-Foley held on 3/31/2014; Change of Plea Hearing as to Lisa Wilson-Foley held on 3/31/2014; Bond Hearing as to Lisa Wilson-Foley held on 3/31/2014; Motion Hearing as to Lisa Wilson-Foley held on 3/31/2014 re 9 filed by Lisa Wilson-Foley ; Plea entered by Lisa Wilson-Foley (2) Guilty Count 1 information. Total Time: 1 hour(Court Reporter FTR.) (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
11 11 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Lisa Wilson-Foley (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO PROBATION FOR PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION AND REPORT as to Lisa Wilson-Foley. First Disclosure-PSI due 5/12/2014, Objections Due 5/26/2014, 2nd-Disclosure PSI due 6/5/2014, Sentencing Memorandum due 6/12/2014, Response due 6/17/2014, Sentencing set for 6/23/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom Three-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Warren W. Eginton. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 3/31/14. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
13 13 Consent Form as to Lisa Wilson-Foley to enter guilty plea before DFM (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
14 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Lisa Wilson-Foley Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 3/31/14. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
15 15 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER as to Lisa Wilson-Foley - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/31/14. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER REFERRING PLEA to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez as to Brian Foley, Lisa Wilson-Foley Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/31/2014. (Ghilardi, K.) Modified on 4/1/2014 Corrected filed date to 3/31/2014 (Ghilardi, K.).
Related: [-]