Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:20-cv-00035
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2020
Case in other court:Missouri Eastern, 4:19-cv-02790
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 30, 2020 2:02 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Joe G. Hollingsworth
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Hagood
Represented By
David Matthew Haynie
Forester Haynie PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, August 26, 2021
11 11 respoth Response Thu 08/26 3:32 PM
Response to Defendant Monsanto's Motion to Dismiss byEric Hagood. (Haynie, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
10 10 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 01/22 12:02 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) Modified on 1/22/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 01/10 8:16 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 01/10 8:15 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/10 8:14 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand by Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) Modified on 1/10/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 01/02 10:36 AM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02790. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Thu 01/02 4:53 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Eastern District of Missouri, 19-02790 Hagood, opened in California Northern District as 20-00035 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 175 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2019
5 5 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
4 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-175) regarding multidistrict litigation by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DLB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
3 3 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (JMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Eric Hagood to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/25/2019. (JMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
2 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
Related: [-]
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7525547, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Eric Hagood.(Haynie, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Original Filing Form