Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:20-cv-00004
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:504 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2020
Terminated:Mar 05, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 30, 2020 4:00 AM CDT
Defendant
Amazon Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Asher B. Griffin
Scott Douglass Mcconnico, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Netflix, Inc.
Represented By
Kate Shih
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Penguin Random House, L.L.C.
Represented By
Jennifer S. Freel
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Victor Baker
Represented By
Justin Michael Welch
Blazier Christensen Browder & Virr, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 05, 2020
15 15 misc Report on Copyright (AO-121) Thu 03/05 5:21 PM
Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights, along with Certified Copy or Order closing case. (cj)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 03/05 4:58 PM
ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
13 13 notice Notice Wed 03/04 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Dismissal by Victor Baker (Welch, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/02 4:06 PM
ORDER: Status Report due by 3/9/2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/12 9:37 AM
Text Order GRANTING11 Joint Motion to Extend Defendants' Answer Deadline entered by Judge Robert Pitman. All Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, (Dkt. 1), on or before February 28, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 02/12 11:59 AM
Reset Answer Deadlines: Amazon Technologies, Inc. answer due 2/28/2020; Netflix, Inc. answer due 2/28/2020; Penguin Random House, L.L.C. answer due 2/28/2020. (cj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 02/11 3:37 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (as to all Defendants) by Netflix, Inc..(Shih, Kate)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 30, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/30 10:49 AM
Text Order GRANTING10 Amended Unopposed Motion to Extend Answer Deadline entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant Netflix, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Victor Baker's Complaint, (Dkt. 1), on or before February 14, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/30 10:52 AM
Text Order MOOTING8 Motion to Extend Answer Deadline entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of the Court's January 30, 2020, Text Order granting Defendant Netflix, Inc.'s Amended Unopposed Motion to Extend Answer Deadline, (Dkt. 10), Netflix, Inc.'s Motion to Extend Answer Deadline, (Dkt. 8), is DENIED AS MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 01/30 12:08 PM
Netflix, Inc. answer due 2/14/2020. (cj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/29 10:28 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Netflix, Inc.. (Shih, Kate)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/28 4:06 PM
Text Order GRANTING9 Unopposed Motion to Extend Answer Deadlineentered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant Amazon Technologies, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Victor Baker's Complaint, (Dkt. 1), on or before February 14, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 01/28 5:03 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amazon Technologies, Inc. answer due 2/14/2020. (lt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2020
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/27 6:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Amazon Technologies, Inc..(Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2020
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/24 5:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Netflix, Inc..(Shih, Kate)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 23, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/23 9:01 AM
Text Order GRANTING7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant Penguin Random House LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Victor Baker's Complaint, (Dkt. 1), on or before February 14, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 01/23 11:21 AM
Penguin Random House, L.L.C. answer due 2/14/2020. (cj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/22 9:12 AM
Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Stipulation to Extend Answer Deadline of Def. Penguin Random House by Penguin Random House, L.L.C.. (Freel, Jennifer) Modified to change from a Stipulation to a Motion on 1/22/2020 (cj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2020
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/09 3:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victor Baker. Amazon Technologies, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Welch, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/07 9:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victor Baker. Netflix, Inc. served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020; Penguin Random House, L.L.C. served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Welch, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 01/03 11:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Amazon Technologies, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Penguin Random House, L.L.C.. (cj)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Report on Copyright (AO-121) Fri 01/03 8:57 AM
Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/02 5:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Victor Baker. (Welch, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13024901), filed by Victor Baker, d/b/a One Treasure Limited and One Treasure Ltd..(Welch, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/02 4:27 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Thu 01/02 4:27 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (dl)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Thu 01/02 4:31 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Victor Baker. (dl)
Related: [-]