Original Case: 2:19-cv-05423

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-55000
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2020
Terminated:Apr 14, 2020
Last checked: Thursday Apr 16, 2020 1:35 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES, 1-10, inclusive
Defendant - Appellee
GREEN CHEF CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By
Matthew Caplan
Cooley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
H AND T SEAFOOD, INC., a California corporation
Represented By
Gregg A. Rapoport
Gregg A. Rapoport, APLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/16/2020 1:28 AM PDT
Thursday, January 02, 2020
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant H and T Seafood, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/09/2020. Transcript ordered by 01/30/2020. Transcript due 03/02/2020. Appellant H and T Seafood, Inc. opening brief due 04/09/2020. Appellee Green Chef Corporation answering brief due 05/11/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11548676] (JBS) [Entered: 01/02/2020 09:58 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet