Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-33097

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Alan C Stout
Case #: 3:20-ap-03001
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2020
Terminated:Apr 13, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Amy Lynette Carr
257 French Lane
Elizabethtown, KY 42701
Represented By
Amy Lynette Carr
contact info
Plaintiff
Bob Swope Ford, Inc.
1100 N. Dixie Avenue
Elizabethtown, KY 42701
Represented By
Taft A. McKinstry
Fowler Measle & Bell PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, April 13, 2020
court Close Case -AP Mon 04/13 8:04 AM
Case Closed. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2020
8 8 order Judgment Fri 03/27 10:22 AM
Order granting Agreed Judgment in favor of the plaintiff. Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Entered on 3/27/2020 (Smithson, M
Thursday, March 26, 2020
7 7 motion Agreed Motion to Pay Thu 03/26 3:40 PM
Agreed Judgment for Amy Lynette Carr to Pay Bob Swope Ford, Inc. 6000.00. Filed by Plaintiff Bob Swope Ford, Inc.. (McKinstry, Taft) Modified on 3/27/2020 (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Fri 02/14 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 02/13/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order To set Trial on (related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Bob Swope Ford, Inc.). Trial scheduled on 4/9/2020 at 10:00 AM (EASTERN) at Courtroom #3, 5th Fl. (6th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. Entered on 2/11/2020
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
5 5 order Set/Continue/Reschedule Pre-Trial/Trial Tue 02/11 1:40 PM
Order To set Trial on Related [+]. Trial scheduled on 4/9/2020 at 10:00 AM (EASTERN) at Courtroom #3, 5th Fl. (6th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. Entered on 2/11/2020 (Smithson, M)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Bob Swope Ford, Inc.
Monday, January 27, 2020
utility Corrective Entry Mon 01/27 7:16 AM
Corrective Entry - document filed using the incorrect docketing event. In the future use the event "Answer to Complaint" located under the Answers/Response category of the Adversary events menu. The Court has made the necessary corrections to this event so no further action is required with regard to this pleading. Related [+]. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by Taft A. McKinstry on behalf of Bob Swope Ford, Inc. against Amy Lynette Carr. Fee Amount $350 filed by Plaintiff Bob Swope Ford, Inc.1 . Filed by Defendant Amy Lynette Carr (Shreve, Thomas) Modified on 1/27/2020. filed by Defendant Amy Lynette Carr
Friday, January 24, 2020
4 4 answer Response Fri 01/24 2:50 PM
Answer to Complaint. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by Taft A. McKinstry on behalf of Bob Swope Ford, Inc. against Amy Lynette Carr. Fee Amount $350 filed by Plaintiff Bob Swope Ford, Inc.1 . Filed by Defendant Amy Lynette Carr (Shreve, Thomas) Modified on 1/27/2020 (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 01/07 10:58 AM
Summons Service Executed on Amy Lynette Carr on 01/07/2020. (McKinstry, Taft)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Tue 01/07 8:13 AM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Amy Lynette Carr. Answer Due 2/6/2020.. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 2/11/2020 at 11:00 AM (EASTERN) at Telephonic Hearing. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/06 11:18 AM
Adversary case 20-03001 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by Taft A. McKinstry on behalf of Bob Swope Ford, Inc. against Amy Lynette Carr. Fee Amount $350(McKinstry, Taft)
Related: [-]