Bob Swope Ford, Inc. v. Carr
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-33097
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-33097
Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan C Stout |
Case #: | 3:20-ap-03001 |
Nature of Suit | 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Amy Lynette Carr
257 French Lane
Elizabethtown, KY 42701 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bob Swope Ford, Inc.
1100 N. Dixie Avenue
Elizabethtown, KY 42701 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
court
Close Case -AP
Mon 04/13 8:04 AM
Case Closed. (Smithson, M) |
||
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order granting Agreed Judgment in favor of the plaintiff. |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Agreed Judgment for Amy Lynette Carr to Pay Bob Swope Ford, Inc. 6000.00. Filed by Plaintiff Bob Swope Ford, Inc.. (McKinstry, Taft) Modified on 3/27/2020 (Smithson, M) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request . Notice Date 02/13/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 11, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order To set Trial on . Trial scheduled on 4/9/2020 at 10:00 AM (EASTERN) at Courtroom #3, 5th Fl. (6th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. Entered on 2/11/2020 (Smithson, M) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
utility
Corrective Entry
Mon 01/27 7:16 AM
Corrective Entry - document filed using the incorrect docketing event. In the future use the event "Answer to Complaint" located under the Answers/Response category of the Adversary events menu. The Court has made the necessary corrections to this event so no further action is required with regard to this pleading. . (Preston, T) |
||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Answer to Complaint. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by Taft A. McKinstry on behalf of Bob Swope Ford, Inc. against Amy Lynette Carr. Fee Amount $350 filed by Plaintiff Bob Swope Ford, Inc.1 . Filed by Defendant Amy Lynette Carr (Shreve, Thomas) Modified on 1/27/2020 (Preston, T) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Service Executed on Amy Lynette Carr on 01/07/2020. (McKinstry, Taft) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Amy Lynette Carr. Answer Due 2/6/2020.. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 2/11/2020 at 11:00 AM (EASTERN) at Telephonic Hearing. (Smithson, M) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-03001 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by Taft A. McKinstry on behalf of Bob Swope Ford, Inc. against Amy Lynette Carr. Fee Amount $350(McKinstry, Taft) |