Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas A Varlan
Referred: H Bruce Guyton
Case #: 3:14-cv-00136
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2014
Last checked: Friday Dec 12, 2014 4:16 AM EST
Defendant
Knox County, Tennessee
Represented By
David S Wigler
Knox County Law Director'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jesse Rudd
Represented By
David S Wigler
Knox County Law Director'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Kristen Wallace
Represented By
David S Wigler
Knox County Law Director'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Regina Barrett
Represented By
Patrick L Looper
Law Office Of Pat Looper
contact info
Russell T Greene
Law Office Of Russell T. Greene
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Barrett
Represented By
Patrick L Looper
Law Office Of Pat Looper
contact info
Russell T Greene
Law Office Of Russell T. Greene
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
42 42 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/22 3:32 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal case by Regina Barrett, Ronald Barrett. (Looper, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2016
41 41 misc Status Report Thu 06/16 3:30 PM
STATUS REPORT by Jesse Rudd(individually), Kristen Wallace(individually). (Morton, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
40 40 order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 06/01 3:16 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/1/16. (JBR)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2016
39 39 misc Affidavit Mon 05/23 1:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Kristin Wallace. (JBR)
Related: [-]
38 38 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/23 1:27 PM
ORDER granting 37 Motion. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file the proposed replacement affidavit [Doc. 37-1] upon entry of this order. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/23/16. (JBR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2016
37 37 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/19 2:37 PM
MOTION File Signed Affidavit re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jesse Rudd(individually), Jesse Rudd(in his official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(in her official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(individually).(Morton, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Wallace Affidavit
36 36 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 05/19 2:31 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint by Jesse Rudd(individually), Jesse Rudd(in his official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(in her official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(individually).(Morton, J)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Order Thu 05/19 8:58 AM
ORDER: The Court's file reflects that plaintiffs filed an amended complaint on January 28, 2015 [Doc. 15 ], and defendants have filed a motion for summary judgment [Doc. 25 ] but have not filed an answer to the amended complaint. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that within ten (10) days of the date of entry of this Order defendants shall file a response to the complaint. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/19/16. (JBR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2016
34 34 misc Affidavit Wed 05/11 3:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Regina Barrett. (JBR)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Wed 05/11 3:15 PM
ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to File Document. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file the proposed supplemental affidavit [Doc. 32-1] upon entry of this order. Defendants shall have ten (10) days from entry of this order in which to file a supplemental reply to plaintiffs' response to their summary judgment motion. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/11/16. (JBR)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2016
32 32 motion Leave to File Document Fri 04/15 3:50 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Affidavit by Regina Barrett, Ronald Barrett.(Looper, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Proposed Affidavit
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/15 2:29 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Knox County, Tennessee, Jesse Rudd(individually), Jesse Rudd(in his official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(in her official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(individually). (Morton, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2016
30 30 5 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 04/08 11:20 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of28 RESPONSE to Motion re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Regina Barrett, Ronald Barrett. (Looper, Patrick) Modified event on 4/8/2016 (JBR)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Response to Statement of Material Facts Fri 04/08 11:18 AM
RESPONSE to Statement of Material Facts re26 Statement of Material Facts, filed by Regina Barrett, Ronald Barrett. (Looper, Patrick)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/08 11:15 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Regina Barrett, Ronald Barrett. (Looper, Patrick) Modified text on 4/8/2016 (JBR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/23 3:32 PM
NOTICE by Jesse Rudd(individually), Kristen Wallace(individually) Of Deposition (Morton, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2016
26 26 respm Statement of Material Facts Fri 03/18 10:52 PM
STATEMENT of Material Facts re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jesse Rudd(individually), Jesse Rudd(in his official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(in her official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(individually). (Morton, J)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Summary Judgment Fri 03/18 10:51 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jesse Rudd(individually), Jesse Rudd(in his official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(in her official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(individually).(Morton, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Officer Rudd Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit Officer Wallace Affidavit
Tuesday, July 28, 2015
24 24 notice Certificate of Counsel Tue 07/28 11:01 AM
Notice of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures of Defendants by J Myers Morton on behalf of All Defendants (Morton, J) Modified text on 7/28/2015 (JBR)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2015
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/20 8:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by J Myers Morton on behalf of All Defendants (Morton, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2015
22 22 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 07/15 11:04 AM
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Knox County is hereby DISMISSED from this action. Additionally, plaintiffs' claims against defendant Jesse Rudd in his official capacity and defendant Kristen Wallace in her official capacity are DISMISSED. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/15/16. (JBR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2015
21 21 order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 07/02 3:55 PM
ORDER granting 20 Motion to Continue. Jury Trial reset for 8/15/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/8/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/2/15. (JBR) Modified text on 7/2/2015 (JBR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2015
20 20 motion Continue Thu 06/11 10:02 AM
Consent MOTION to Continue by Knox County, Tennessee, Jesse Rudd(individually), Jesse Rudd(in his official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(in her official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(individually). (Wigler, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2015
19 19 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 03/26 3:35 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wigler, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
18 18 order Deposition Order Tue 03/10 11:50 AM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/10/15. (JBR)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/10 11:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/14/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/10/15. (JBR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 19, 2015
16 16 motion Dismiss Thu 02/19 10:46 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Knox County, Tennessee. (Wigler, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 28, 2015
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/28 9:21 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Regina Barrett, Ronald Barrett. (Filed as of August 21, 2014 per Order14 (ABF)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 01/28 9:16 AM
ORDER that the plaintiffs motion to amend their complaint 12 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to refile plaintiffs Proposed Amended Complaint [Doc. 12-4] as a new document with a filing date of August 21, 2014, and the new document shall serve as plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Defendants motion to dismiss 9 is DENIED without prejudice as moot. Defendants shall have until twenty-one (21) days after the Clerk of Court has refiled plaintiffs Amended Complaint in which to respond to it. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/28/15. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 21, 2014
13 13 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF EXHIBIT B by Regina Barrett, Ronald Barrett re12 RESPONSE to9 MOTION TO DISMISS. (DVD Disk received and forwarded to Chambers) (ABF)
Related: [-]
12 12 RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the alternative, MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Regina Barrett, Ronald Barrett.(Looper, Patrick) Modified event on 8/21/2014 (ABF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Other proposed amended complaint
Tuesday, August 05, 2014
11 11 (Case at Issue) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge Consent Form. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 04, 2014
10 10 ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Jesse Rudd and Kristen Wallace (in their Individual capacity).(Wigler, David) Modified filers on 8/5/2014 (ABF).
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Knox County, Jesse Rudd and Kristen Wallace (in their official capacity). (Wigler, David) Modified filers on 8/5/2014 (ABF).
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 03, 2014
8 8 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Based upon the lack of opposition, see Doc. 7, Defendants shall have up to and including August 4, 2014 , in which to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 07/03/14. (LWM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 02, 2014
7 7 NOTICE by Knox County, Tennessee, Jesse Rudd(individually), Jesse Rudd(in his official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(in her official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(individually) re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint (Wigler, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Knox County, Tennessee, Jesse Rudd(individually), Jesse Rudd(in his official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(in her official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department), Kristen Wallace(individually). (Wigler, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 27, 2014
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Barrett, Ronald Barrett. Kristen Wallace(in her official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department) served on 6/26/2014; Kristen Wallace(individually) served on 6/26/2014. (Looper, Patrick)
Related: [-]
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Barrett, Ronald Barrett. Jesse Rudd(individually) served on 6/26/2014; Jesse Rudd(in his official capacity as a corrections officer of the Knox County Sheriff's Department) served on 6/26/2014. (Looper, Patrick)
Related: [-]
3 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Barrett, Ronald Barrett. Knox County, Tennessee served on 4/16/2014. (Looper, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2014
2 2 Summons Issued as to Knox County, Tennessee, Jesse Rudd, and Kristen Wallace. (AYB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Jesse Rudd,
Att: 2 Summons Kristen Wallace
Wednesday, April 02, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-2503788.), filed by Regina Barrett, Ronald Barrett.(Looper, Patrick) (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/2/2014 with flattened .pdf) (AYB).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons civil summons,
Att: 2 Summons civil summons,
Att: 3 Summons civil summons,
Att: 4 Other civil cover sheet
Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton have been assigned to this case. (AYB)
Related: [-]