Love County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45000 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 07, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma Eastern, 6:19-cv-00320 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 13, 2020 1:03 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Keysource Medical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co LLC
|
|
Defendant
Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Physicians Total Care Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Lynn Webster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GCP Pharma LLC
|
|
Defendant
Harvard Drug Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Love County Board of County Commissioners
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/13/2020 1:04 PM EST |
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., CVS Health Corp., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Perry Fine, GCP Pharma, LLC, Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Keysource Medical, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corp., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc., Lynn Webster by Love County Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | ||
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/23/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1302598 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | ||
1 | 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Removal from Love County District Court, case number CJ-2019-008 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (jcb, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Att: 32 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 32 - Summons - Morris, | ||
Att: 33 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 33 - Summons - Quest, | ||
Att: 34 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 34 - Summons - Harvard, | ||
Att: 35 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 35 - Summons - PTC, | ||
Att: 36 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 36 - Summons - PTC, | ||
Att: 37 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 37 - Summons - PTC, | ||
Att: 38 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 38 - Summons - CVS, | ||
Att: 39 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 39 - Summons - CVS, | ||
Att: 40 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 40 - Summons - Oklahoma CVS, | ||
Att: 41 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 41 - Summons - Walgreens, | ||
Att: 42 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 42 - Summons - Walgreens, | ||
Att: 43 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 43 - Summons - Fine, | ||
Att: 44 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 44 - Summons - Webster, | ||
Att: 45 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 45 - EOA - Quest, | ||
Att: 46 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 46 - Motion - Quest, | ||
Att: 47 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 47 - EOA - McKesson, | ||
Att: 48 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 48 - Motion - McKesson, | ||
Att: 49 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 49 - EOA - Harvard Drug, | ||
Att: 50 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 50 - EOA - Cardinal, | ||
Att: 51 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 51 - EOA - Amerisource, | ||
Att: 52 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 52 - EOA - Anda, | ||
Att: 53 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 53 - Motion - Anda, | ||
Att: 54 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 54 - Motion - CVS, | ||
Att: 55 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 55 - Order - CVS, | ||
Att: 56 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 56 - Order - Anda, | ||
Att: 57 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 57 - Motion - Manufacturer Defendants, | ||
Att: 58 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 58 - Order - McKesson, | ||
Att: 59 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 59 - Order - Defendants Motion, | ||
Att: 60 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 60 - Order - Manufacturer, | ||
Att: 61 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 61 - EOA - Purdue, | ||
Att: 62 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 62 - Notice of Bankruptcy, | ||
Att: 63 (9/23/2019) Exhibit 63 - Docket Sheet | ||
3 | 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. ( Filing Fee due by 9/30/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
4 | 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
5 | 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
6 | 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
8 | 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
9 | 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
10 | 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
11 | 11 SUPPLEMENTAL Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is hereby randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-320-SPS.(lal, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D.) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
15 | 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D.) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
16 | 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 10/15/2019(Riddles, D.) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
17 | 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
18 | 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
19 | 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
20 | 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Corporate Parent Generic Drug Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent HDG Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The) by Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
21 | 21 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Accordingly, Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint within forty-five (45) days following the entry of: (1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
22 | 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing parties to submit a completed Consent/District Judge Option form within fourteen (14) days. Consent forms provided to parties. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
23 | 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. Responses due by 10/16/2019(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
24 | 24 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING23 Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Accordingly, Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, LLC and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Petition within sixty (60) days following the entry of: (1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
25 | 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley E. Quinn on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Quinn, Ashley) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
26 | 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying Corporate Parents Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. and Cupric Holding Co., Inc. for Cephalon, Inc.; Corporate Parents Orvet UK Unlimited, Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Other Affiliates Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A. and IVAX LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actvais, LLC, and Watson Laboratories, Inc.) by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Quinn, Ashley) Modified on 10/9/2019: added corporate parents and other affiliates and edited text (nm, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
27 | 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert G. McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Thursday, October 10, 2019 | ||
28 | 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 10/24/2019(Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
29 | 29 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., and Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc. shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Petition within forty-five (45) days following the entry of: (1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
30 | 30 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Gregory K. Frizzell of the Northern District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-320-GKF. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
31 | 31 MOTION to Remand by Love County Board of County Commissioners (With attachments) [NOTE: Attorney Todd A. Court added to party Love County Board of County Commissioners(pty:pla)]. Responses due by 11/6/2019(Court, Todd) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
32 | 32 MOTION to Expedite Ruling by Love County Board of County Commissioners (With attachments) Responses due by 11/6/2019(Court, Todd) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
33 | 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corp., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Responses due by 11/12/2019(Sharpe, G.) Modified on 10/30/2019 to add filer. (tls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
34 | 34 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey A. Curran on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
35 | 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD for Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc.) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
36 | 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 11/12/2019(Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
37 | 37 ORDER by Judge Gregory K. Frizzell granting33 Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
38 | 38 ORDER by Judge Gregory K. Frizzell granting36 Defendants Anda, Inc. and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
39 | 39 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K. Frizzell directing Defendants to file their expedited Responses by 11/6/2019 to32 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand. No Replies shall be filed. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
44 | 44 CERTIFIED ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804) , transferring case to Northern District of Ohio. (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
40 | 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
41 | 41 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
42 | 42 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
43 | 43 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 1/7/2020.] | |
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
45 | 45 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Eastern. Case number 6:19-cv-00320. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |