New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Anne Y Shields
Case #: 2:20-cv-00124
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2020
Terminated:Jul 06, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Jul 05, 2020 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Beys Specialty, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas J. Bianco
Meltzer, Lippe, Goldenstein & Breitstone, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gino Castignoli
Represented By
Richard M. Pettigrew, Jr.
Markowitz & Richman
contact info
Stephen C. Richman
Markowitz & Richman
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Salgo
Represented By
Richard M. Pettigrew, Jr.
Markowitz & Richman
contact info
Stephen C. Richman
Markowitz & Richman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 06, 2020
order Order Dismissing Case Mon 07/06 11:50 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: In light of the settlement in principle this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to its reinstatement should the settlement not be consummated. Barring any further requests for an extension within 90 days of this order, this dismissal shall deemed with prejudice.Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/6/2020. (McMorrow, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
order Scheduling Order Tue 06/16 10:09 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re15 Letter filed by Beys Specialty, Inc.: Based on the parties' representation that this action has settled, counsel are directed to submit a stipulation of discontinuance to the assigned District Judge within forty-five (45) days. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/16/2020. (Minerva, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
15 15 misc Letter Mon 06/15 1:50 PM
Letter to the Honorable Anne Y. Shields Re: Joint Status Letter by Beys Specialty, Inc. (Bianco, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2020
order Scheduling Order Fri 03/27 9:30 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re14 Letter filed by Michael Salgo, Gino Castignoli. In light of the representations set forth in counsels' letter, it appears that the parties are working together to engage in voluntary discovery and to reach a settlement herein. In accord with their request, this Court directs that the parties report to this court by way of a joint status letter to be filed on the docket herein on June 15, 2020, as to whether this matter has settled. In the event that it has not settled, that letter must submit a joint detailed discovery plan setting forth, with particularity, the discovery necessary for this matter to be trial ready. Status Report due by 6/15/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 3/27/2020. (Shields, Anne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
14 14 misc Letter Thu 03/26 12:35 PM
Letter from Counsel for Parties by Gino Castignoli(as Trustee on his own behalf and on behalf of the other Trustees of Plasterers Local 262 Pension Fund), Gino Castignoli, Michael Salgo (Pettigrew, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2020
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/23 5:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the current health crisis, the initial conference scheduled for April 1, 2020 is cancelled. In lieu of an appearance, counsel for the parties are directed to comply with the attached Order by April 1, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 3/23/2020. (Minerva, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 02/24 10:45 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The initial conference scheduled for March 12, 2020 is adjourned to April 1, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 830, Alfonse M. D'Amato U.S. Courthouse, Central Islip, New York. All counsel shall appear. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/24/2020. (Minerva, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
12 12 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 02/21 12:09 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Gino Castignoli(as Trustee on his own behalf and on behalf of the other Trustees of Plasterers Local 262 Pension Fund), Gino Castignoli, Michael Salgo. (Pettigrew, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, February 14, 2020
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/14 2:51 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See Order and Attachment. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/14/2020. (Torres, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AYS Rules
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/12 12:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Beys Specialty, Inc.. (Bianco, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/12 12:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beys Specialty, Inc. (Bianco, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/12 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Bianco on behalf of Beys Specialty, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bianco, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/04 3:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gino Castignoli(as Trustee on his own behalf and on behalf of the other Trustees of Plasterers Local 262 Pension Fund), Gino Castignoli, Michael Salgo. Beys Specialty, Inc. served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/12/2020. (Pettigrew, Richard)
Related: [-]
order Order to Answer Tue 02/04 11:13 AM
ORDER TO ANSWER re6 Letter filed by Beys Specialty, Inc.: Beys Specialty, Inc. answer due 2/12/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/4/2020. (Minerva, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
6 6 misc Letter Mon 02/03 4:23 PM
Letter from Thomas J. Bianco, Esq. to Judge Gary R. Brown respectfully requesting a brief extension for defendant Beys Specialty, Inc. to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on consent by Beys Specialty, Inc. (Bianco, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/28 4:12 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Gary R. Brown. Judge Denis R. Hurley no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Russo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/10 9:36 AM
Summons Issued as to Beys Specialty, Inc.. (Cubano, Jazmin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2020
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/09 11:33 AM
Proposed Summons. by Gino Castignoli(as Trustee on his own behalf and on behalf of the other Trustees of Plasterers Local 262 Pension Fund), Gino Castignoli, Michael Salgo (Pettigrew, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 01/08 4:33 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 01/08 4:24 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Wed 01/08 4:25 PM
Proposed summons is rejected; the caption on the summons does not match the caption of the complaint; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit a completed proposed summons in PDF fillable format using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/08 4:31 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/07 2:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Beys Specialty, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12225046 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Gino Castignoli, Michael Salgo. (Pettigrew, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit