Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Linda V Parker
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:20-cv-10041
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2020
Re-opened:Sep 25, 2020
Terminated:Sep 25, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Jul 05, 2020 5:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Litcos Consulting, LLC
Represented By
Daniel J. Lehman
The Integrated Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Timothy Michael Little
Represented By
Daniel J. Lehman
The Integrated Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Flint Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee Trust
Represented By
Hope L. Calati
Watkins, Pawlick, Calati & Prifti, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Flint Labor-Management Cooperation Fund
Represented By
Hope L. Calati
Watkins, Pawlick, Calati & Prifti, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michigan Electrical Employees Health Plan
Represented By
Hope L. Calati
Watkins, Pawlick, Calati & Prifti, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michigan Electrical Employees' Pension Fund
Represented By
Hope L. Calati
Watkins, Pawlick, Calati & Prifti, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
National Electrical Annuity Plan
Represented By
Hope L. Calati
Watkins, Pawlick, Calati & Prifti, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
National Electrical Benefit Fund
Represented By
Hope L. Calati
Watkins, Pawlick, Calati & Prifti, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 25, 2020
15 15 order Judgment - Consent Fri 09/25 3:30 PM
CONSENT ORDER (A) Setting Aside Order Administratively Staying the Case as to Timothy Michael Little, and (B) Entering an Amended and Restated Judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants Litcos Consulting, LLC and Timothy Michael Little, Individually, Jointly and Severally. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
14 14 service Certificate of Service Fri 08/07 9:03 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re13 Consent Judgment by Flint Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee Trust, Flint Labor-Management Cooperation Fund, Michigan Electrical Employees Health Plan, Michigan Electrical Employees' Pension Fund, National Electrical Annuity Plan, National Electrical Benefit Fund (Calati, Hope)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
13 13 order Judgment - Consent Tue 08/04 4:15 PM
STIPULATION and CONSENT JUDGMENT Against Litcos Consulting, LLC. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 19, 2020
12 12 notice Appear* Sun 07/19 8:49 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford . (MarW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation,
Att: 2 Document Continuation
Friday, July 10, 2020
11 11 trial Witness List Fri 07/10 2:20 PM
Plaintiffs' Witness List WITNESS LIST by Flint Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee Trust, Flint Labor-Management Cooperation Fund, Michigan Electrical Employees Health Plan, Michigan Electrical Employees' Pension Fund, National Electrical Annuity Plan, National Electrical Benefit Fund (Calati, Hope)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
10 10 3 pgs order Order Tue 07/07 10:12 AM
ORDER Administratively Staying Case as to Defendant Timothy Michael Little. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
9 9 order Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge* Thu 04/30 10:41 AM
ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Stafford: Settlement Conference - To be conducted sometime after September 11, 2020. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/30 10:40 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER (PHASE I): Discovery due by 9/11/2020 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 10/26/2020 . Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. Related [+] (RLou)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 04/30 10:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/30/2020. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (RLou)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
7 7 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Fri 04/24 11:04 AM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Calati, Hope)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
6 6 notice Appear* Tue 03/31 3:46 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2020
5 5 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 03/27 4:37 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Litcos Consulting, LLC (Lehman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/27 4:35 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Lehman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued* Thu 01/09 10:18 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Timothy Michael Little* (LGra)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Thu 01/09 10:18 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Litcos Consulting, LLC* (LGra)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Thu 01/09 10:16 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LGra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 01/07 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Flint Labor-Management Cooperation Fund, National Electrical Benefit Fund, Michigan Electrical Employees Health Plan, Michigan Electrical Employees' Pension Fund, National Electrical Annuity Plan, Flint Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee Trust against Litcos Consulting, LLC, Timothy Michael Little. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7550799 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Ingham - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Calati, Hope)
Related: [-]