Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:S Maurice Hicks, Jr
Referred: Mark L Hornsby
Case #: 5:20-cv-00021
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2020
Terminated:Mar 21, 2022
Case in other court:26th JDC (Bossier Parish), C160605
Last checked: Sunday Jul 05, 2020 3:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By
Christian B Bogart
Duplass Zwain Et Al
contact info
Andrew J Lair
Duplass Zwain Et Al
contact info
Defendant
Posados Cafe Inc
400 Travis St Ste 504
Shreveport, LA 71101
Represented By
Christian B Bogart
Duplass Zwain Et Al
contact info
Andrew J Lair
Duplass Zwain Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Mysty E Henry
Represented By
Jerome Harold Moroux
Broussard & David
contact info
Javonna R Charles-Young
Law Office Of Javonna Charles-Young
contact info
Scott Michael Richard
Broussard & David
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, March 21, 2022
40 40 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (30, 60, 90 day) Mon 03/21 12:04 PM
60 DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE. It is ordered that this action is hereby dismissed, without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 60 days of the signing of this Order, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. The Clerk is now requested to close this case. It is further ordered that within 60 days of the signing of this Order, the parties shall submit to the Court: (1) a joint motion to dismiss accompanied by a proposed order; or (2) a Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared in this action. Any motion that may be pending in this case is hereby denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/21/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
39 39 order Scheduling Order - Hicks Fri 01/14 3:51 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendants moved to continue the trial date and remaining deadlines, but the order they submitted addressed only the trial date. In light of the trial being continued from March 21, 2022 to May 23, 2022, all unexpired deadlines are extended by 60 days. The pretrial order is due before noon on April 7, 2022. The pretrial conference will be before Chief Judge Hicks on April 14, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Instructions regarding the various deadlines are set forth in the Amended Scheduling Order Doc32 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/14/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 01/12 2:50 PM
ORDER granting36 Motion to Continue. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Continue Trial is granted, and the jury trial of this matter previously set for March 21, 2022 is hereby continued and is re-set for May 23, 2022 at 8:30 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/12/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
37 37 misc Proposed Order/Judgment Tue 01/11 10:21 AM
PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Posados Cafe Inc re36 Motion to Continue. (aty,Lair, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
36 36 motion Continue Mon 01/10 4:31 PM
MOTION to Continue Trial with consent by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Posados Cafe Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/10/2022.(aty,Lair, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Life Care Plan
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
35 35 minutes Status Conference Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Tue 10/19 3:33 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Telephone STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/19/2021. The court directed the defense to make arrangements for its 30(b)(6) deposition in November. Plaintiff's deadline for expert reports is extended to December 22, 2021. The deadline for Defendant's expert reports is extended to January 22, 2022. The deadline for completion of all fact discovery and expert discovery is February 15, 2022. All other dates and deadlines including the trial date remain in effect. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
34 34 order Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 10/04 3:05 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A telephone Status Conference has been set for 10/19/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/4/2021. (crt,Rider, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
33 33 motion Extension (Other) Thu 09/30 11:11 AM
MOTION for Extension of Briefing Deadlines with consent sought but not yet obtained by Mysty E Henry. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/30/2021.(aty,Moroux, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
32 32 order Scheduling Order - Hicks Wed 05/12 4:15 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/21/2022 at 8:30 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr. Pretrial Order due by 2/10/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 10/30/2021. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 12/5/2021. Discovery deadline 9/30/2021. Expert Depositions due by 1/15/2022. Daubert Motions due by 2/7/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 1/6/2022. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/20/2022. Motions in Limine due by 2/3/2022. Trial Depositions due by 1/20/2022. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 3/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/12/2021. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
31 31 minutes Status Conference Wed 05/12 4:11 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: Telephone SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/12/2021. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
30 30 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/04 11:33 AM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The telephone Status Conference originally set for 4/30/21 has been reset for 5/12/2021 at 10:30 AM. Dial-in information has been emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/4/2021. (crt,Rider, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
29 29 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/13 9:59 AM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The telephone Status Conference originally set for 4/13/21 has been reset for 4/30/2021 at 10:00 AM. Dial-in instructions have been emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/13/2021. (crt,Rider, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 03/17 4:22 PM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Continue. Trial of this matter previously set for July 12, 2021 is hereby continued and all deadlines will be extended accordingly. The court will initiate a telephone status conference to discuss the above on the 13th day of April, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel. Trial counsel must participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/17/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
27 27 motion Continue Mon 03/15 12:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial Date and All Deadlines by Mysty E Henry. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/15/2021.(aty,Moroux, Jerome) Modified on 3/15/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Thursday, January 28, 2021
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Thu 01/28 3:47 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline. The Deadline to Complete Discovery is extended for thirty (30) days. All other deadlines remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/28/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
25 25 motion Extension (Other) Wed 01/27 11:18 AM
MOTION for Extension of Extend Discovery Deadline with consent by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Posados Cafe Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/27/2021.(aty,Lair, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Thursday, October 08, 2020
24 24 order Scheduling Order - Hicks Fri 10/09 10:05 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/12/2021 at 8:30 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr. Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 1/30/2021. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 3/3/2021. Discovery deadline 1/30/2021. Expert Depositions due by 3/31/2021. Daubert Motions due by 4/21/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 4/29/2021. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 5/13/2021. Motions in Limine due by 5/27/2021. Trial Depositions due by 6/21/2021. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 7/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/8/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Status Conference Fri 10/09 8:36 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: Telephone STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/8/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
22 22 order Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 09/01 3:08 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A telephone Status Conference has been set for 10/5/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/1/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Order on Motion for Hearing Wed 08/05 3:01 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Continue; granting20 Motion for Hearing. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is granted, and a Telephone Conference to Select New Trial Date and Issue New Scheduling Order is granted. A conference will be set by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/5/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
20 20 motion Continue Hearing Tue 08/04 2:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial, Motion for Status Conference with consent by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Posados Cafe Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/4/2020.(aty,Lair, Andrew). Added MOTION for Hearing and modified docket text on 8/4/2020 (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Thursday, July 16, 2020
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Thu 07/16 3:24 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/16/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
18 18 motion Extension (Other) Wed 07/15 2:50 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Posados Cafe Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/15/2020.(aty,Lair, Andrew) Modified on 7/15/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Thursday, February 27, 2020
17 17 order Scheduling Order - Hicks Fri 02/28 1:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/25/2021 at 8:30 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 1:30 PM in chambers before Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr. Pretrial Order due by 12/10/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 3/31/2020. Witness List due by 5/1/2020. Defendant's witness list is due seven (7) days after receipt of plaintiff's list. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 8/31/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 9/30/2020. Discovery deadline 7/31/2020. Expert Depositions due by 10/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2020. Daubert Motions due by 11/20/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 11/5/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 11/19/2020. Motions in Limine due by 12/3/2020. Trial Depositions due by 12/21/2020. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/27/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 02/28 1:53 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: Telephone SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/27/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
15 15 misc Rule 26(f) Report Thu 02/20 12:15 PM
RULE 26(f) Report by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Posados Cafe Inc, Mysty E Henry. (aty,Lair, Andrew) Modified on 2/20/2020 to add filers. (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel Thu 01/30 1:14 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Jerome Harold Moroux,Scott Michael Richard for Mysty E Henry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/29/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/29 5:19 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Lair, Andrew)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/29 5:15 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Posados Cafe Inc. (aty,Lair, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Minute Entry Wed 01/29 3:46 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The scheduling conference set for 2/27/20 at 10:30 a.m. will now be conducted by telephone. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate, and the use of cell phones is prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/29/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2020
10 10 misc Corrective Document Mon 01/27 10:04 AM
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Certificate of Consent filed by Mysty E Henry regarding8 Motion to Enroll Jerome H Moroux and Scott M Richard. (aty,Moroux, Jerome) Modified on 1/27/2020 to modify docket entry relationship and modify docket text. (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 01/24 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Jerome Harold Moroux on behalf of Mysty E Henry regarding8 MOTION for Jerome H. Moroux and Scott M. Richard to Enroll as Counsel . Reason: Requires signature of present counsel of record. (Attorney Jerome Harold Moroux added to party Mysty E Henry(pty:pla)) (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Enroll as Counsel Fri 01/24 2:00 PM
DEFICIENT ? MOTION for Jerome H. Moroux and Scott M. Richard to Enroll as Counsel by Mysty E Henry. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby.(Attorney Jerome Harold Moroux added to party Mysty E Henry(pty:pla))(aty,Moroux, Jerome) Modified on 1/24/2020 to modify docket text to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Thursday, January 23, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure-2nd NOTICE (Form Included) Thu 01/23 9:26 AM
SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re:2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Andrew J Lair, Christian B Bogart on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Posados Cafe Inc. Show Cause Response due by 2/6/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Thu 01/16 8:46 AM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 2/13/2020. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 2/20/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 2/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/15/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
5 5 order Removal Order Wed 01/08 11:56 AM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/8/2020. (crt,Reeves, T)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Wed 01/08 10:49 AM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/8/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
3 3 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Tue 01/07 2:21 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Tue 01/07 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Andrew J Lair, Christian B Bogart on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Pasados Cafe, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/21/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 01/07 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier, Case Number C160605 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4147457) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Pasados Cafe, Inc..(Attorney Andrew J Lair added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew J Lair added to party Pasados Cafe, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Lair, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Listing of Counsel,
Att: 2 Certificate of Notice to Adverse Party,
Att: 3 Verification,
Att: 4 Proof of Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit A - State Ct Pleadings,
Att: 6 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Petition,
Att: 7 Exhibit C - Discovery Responses,
Att: 8 Civil cover sheet
answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/07 2:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Pasados Cafe, Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #6 OF DOCUMENT1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/07 2:17 PM
CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
Related: [-]