Original Case: 2:18-cv-05607

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-55014
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2020
Terminated:Mar 22, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 23, 2021 4:05 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF SOUTH PASADENA
Represented By
David M. Ferrante
Wesierski & Zurek, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF SOUTH PASADENA POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By
David M. Ferrante
Wesierski & Zurek, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ARTHUR MILLER, Police Chief
Represented By
David M. Ferrante
Wesierski & Zurek, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CRAIG PHILLIPS, Officer
Represented By
David M. Ferrante
Wesierski & Zurek, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SPENCER LOUIE, Sergeant
Represented By
David M. Ferrante
Wesierski & Zurek, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL PALMIERI, Detective
Represented By
David M. Ferrante
Wesierski & Zurek, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MATTHEW RONNIE, Sergeant
Represented By
David M. Ferrante
Wesierski & Zurek, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JIM VALENCIA, Sergeant
Represented By
David M. Ferrante
Wesierski & Zurek, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DOES, 1-10
Plaintiff - Appellant
AROGANT HOLLYWOOD
Represented By
Arogant Hollywood
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/23/2021 4:02 AM PDT
Monday, January 06, 2020
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Arogant Hollywood opening brief due 03/09/2020. Appellees City of South Pasadena, City of South Pasadena Police Department, Does, Spencer Louie, Arthur Miller, Michael Palmieri, Craig Phillips, Matthew Ronnie and Jim Valencia answering brief due 04/09/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11551701] (RT) [Entered: 01/06/2020 11:54 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 55 pgs Case Opening Packet