City of Kenosha, Wisconsin v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45011 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 08, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Wisconsin Eastern, 2:19-cv-01829 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2020 1:43 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Kenosha, Wisconsin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/14/2020 1:42 PM EST |
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) [Transferred from wied on 1/8/2020.] | ||
1 | 1 298 pgs COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by City of Kenosha, Wisconsin. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3305638)(Mansour, Christine) [Transferred from wied on 1/8/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER received from the Northern District of Ohio issued by the MDL panel. Case to be transferred for inclusion with MDL No. 2804. Case Terminated. (cc: all counsel)(mlm) [Transferred from wied on 1/8/2020.] | |
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wisconsin Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-01829. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |