Bath County Fiscal Court v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45012 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 08, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 0:19-cv-00130 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2020 1:47 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Bath County Fiscal Court
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/14/2020 1:46 PM EST |
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
Conflict Check run. (KSS) [Transferred from kyed on 1/8/2020.] | ||
Clerk's Note: re1 Complaint MDL Panel (cc: SKV) notified of possible tag along case (MDL No. 2804) by e-mail with a copy of the complaint and docket sheet (KSS) [Transferred from kyed on 1/8/2020.] | ||
1 | 1 172 pgs COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4542852), filed by Bath County Fiscal Court.(KSS) [Transferred from kyed on 1/8/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
3 | 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: CIVIL CASES RELATED TO COMPLAINTS FILED AGAINST AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC. and McKESSON CORPORATION: 1. Effective immediately, Clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to the case, Anderson County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al. filed as Frankfort Civil Action 17-cv-70 to the Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove; 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/22/17.(KSS)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 1/8/2020.] | |
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 1/8/2020.] | |
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 127 filed in MDL Case Number 2804. (JLS)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 1/8/2020.] | |
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 0:19-cv-00130. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |