California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:20-cr-00033
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2020 11:31 PM PST
Defendant
Roman Isaiah Castillo (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Jesus Mosqueda
Federal Defenders
contact info
Material Witness
Deng Qin Chen
Represented By
Jonathan D Frank
Law Office Of Jonathan D Frank
contact info
Material Witness
Song Di Zhan
Represented By
Jonathan D Frank
Law Office Of Jonathan D Frank
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alicia Phillip Williams
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Jun 23 2020
JUDGMENT as to Roman Isaiah Castillo (1), Count(s) 1, Custody of BOP for 9 months; Supervised release for 3 years; P/A $100.00 imposed; $5000.00 JVTA waived; No fine; Count(s) 2, Govt's oral motion to dismiss is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes. (tcf)
GPO Jul 13 2022
Revocation of Supervised Release/Probation Judgment and Commitment as to Roman Isaiah Castillo (1) - SUPERVISED RELEASE REVOKED 7/13/2022 - Custody of BOP for 10 months to run consecutively to State sentence defendant may be serving, no supervised release to follow. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes. (ave)

Docket last updated: 01/08/2020 11:59 PM PST
Monday, December 09, 2019
Arrest of Roman Isaiah Castillo (no document attached) (mxn) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Roman Isaiah Castillo.(mxn) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Jonathan D Frank appointed for Deng Qin Chen and Song Di Zhan. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Roman Isaiah Castillo: Initial Appearance set for 12/10/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. (no document attached) (acc) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Status Hearing re Initial Appearance as to Roman Isaiah Castillo held on 12/10/2019. Defendant not appearing. Federal Defenders provisionally appointed for Roman Isaiah Castillo. ( Initial Appearance set for 12/13/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford.) (CD# 12/10/2019 KSC 19-1:4:06-4:10). (Plaintiff Attorney Conor McMahon AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Lauren Clark FD-S/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
4 4 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Roman Isaiah Castillo: Arraignment of MW set for 12/11/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. (no document attached) (als) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Arraignment of Material Witnesses Deng Qin Chen, Song Di Zhan held on 12/11/2019. Material Witness bail set as to each at $15,000 PS w/10% percent cash deposit, M/W must be able to legally remain in the U.S. and follow PTS supervision. (Interpreter Yan Gu). (CD# 12/11/2019 KSC 19-1:2:04-2:13). (Plaintiff Attorney Conor McMahon AUSA). (Defendant Attorney n/a). (no document attached) (aje) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Deng Qin Chen. Material Witness Bond set for $15,000 PS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/11/2019. (jmr) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Song Di Zhan. Material Witness Bond set for $15,000 PS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/11/2019. (jmr) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jesus Mosqueda appearing for Roman Isaiah Castillo (Mosqueda, Jesus)Attorney Jesus Mosqueda added to party Roman Isaiah Castillo(pty:dft) (vxc). [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2019
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Initial Appearance as to Roman Isaiah Castillo held on 12/13/2019. The Court confirms the appointment of counsel. Bond set as to Roman Isaiah Castillo (1) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and 10% cash deposit. Preliminary Hearing set for 12/24/19 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Arraignment set for 1/07/2020 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. (CD# 12/13/2019 Ksc 19-1:2:32-3:30). (Plaintiff Attorney Conor McMahon AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Max Schoening FD-S/A). (aje) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
10 10 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Roman Isaiah Castillo (no document attached) (aje) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Roman Isaiah Castillo (1) $10,000 PS.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 12/13/2019. (ADI, jxv) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
14 14 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Roman Isaiah Castillo (ADI, jxv) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
12 12 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Roman Isaiah Castillo. At the request of MW counsel, Motion Hearing - Material Witness set for 1/7/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. (no document attached) (ecs) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Alicia Phillip Williams appearing for USA. (Williams, Alicia)Attorney Alicia Phillip Williams added to party USA(pty:pla) (smd). [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2019
15 15 MOTION to Take Deposition , MOTION for reports pursuant to federal rules of criminal procedure, rule 46(h)(1) and (2) by Deng Qin Chen, Song Di Zhan as to Roman Isaiah Castillo.(Frank, Jonathan) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Friday, December 20, 2019
16 16 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Roman Isaiah Castillo. Preliminary Hearing reset for 12/23/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. (ecs) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2019
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Preliminary Hearing not held as to Roman Isaiah Castillo. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 1/7/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. (CD# 12/23/2019 KSC 933-940). (Plaintiff Attorney Ronald Sou AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Paul Barr FD). (ecs) [3:19-mj-05470-KSC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
18 18 INFORMATION as to Roman Isaiah Castillo (1) count(s) 1-2. (ag)
Related: [-]
19 19 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Roman Isaiah Castillo (ag)
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Arraignment on Information as to Roman Isaiah Castillo (1) Count 1-2 held on 1/7/2020. Not Guilty plea entered.( Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 2/18/2020 02:00 PM before Judge William Q. Hayes.); Motion Hearing - Material Witness in case as to Roman Isaiah Castillo held on 1/7/2020 re15 MOTION to Take Deposition MOTION for reports pursuant to federal rules of criminal procedure, rule 46(h)(1) and (2) filed by Deng Qin Chen, Song Di Zhan - Motion Granted. MW Depositions to be held 1/28/20 at 10:00 AM. (CD# 1/7/2020 KSC 1000-1009). (Plaintiff Attorney J Forrest AUSA). (Defendant Attorney S Premjee FD). (Material Witness Attorney J Frank CJA). (no document attached) (ecs)
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER TO DEPOSE MATERIAL WITNESSES: DENG QIN CHEN and SONG DI ZHAN, as to Roman Isaiah Castillo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 1/7/2020. (ag)
Related: [-]