Donna Deitrick v. Mark Costa, et al
Original Case: 4:06-cv-01556
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01034 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 08, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 05, 2021 4:27 AM EST |
Defendant
DENNIS MOORE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANE M. ACRI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KEVIN BALASCIK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JAMES BROWN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CITY OF SHAMOKIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARK A. COSTA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LINDA L. LONG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VANESSA LONG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WILLIAM MINER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RICHARD NICHOLS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT SEARLS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SHAMOKIN POLICE DEPARTMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT YONCUSKI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WILLIAM ZELINSKI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MARIANNE ADAMS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JEFF ADAMS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JANE M. ACRI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DONNA DEITRICK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF SHAMOKIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT SEARLS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DENNIS MOORE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES BROWN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KEVIN BALASCIK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LINDA L. LONG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
VANESSA LONG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT YONCUSKI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
THOMAS YONCUSKI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SHAMOKIN POLICE DEPARTMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM ZELINSKI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RICHARD NICHOLS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM MINER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARK A. COSTA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DONNA DEITRICK
|
Represented By
|
![]() NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: AMBRO, PORTER and ROTH, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 13. Judge: AMBRO Authoring. [20-1028, 20-1034, 20-1038] |
Docket last updated: 03/05/2021 4:27 AM EST |
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Jeff Adams and Marianne Adams in District Court No. 4-06-cv-01556. (PDB) | ||
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
![]() |