Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 6:20-cv-00013
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2020
Terminated:Jan 31, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 07, 2020 3:52 AM CDT
Defendant
Emerson Electric Co.
Plaintiff
Circuit Ventures LLC
Represented By
Jay B. Johnson
Kizzia Johnson PLLC
contact info
D. Bradley Kizzia
Kizzia & Johnson PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, January 31, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/31 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Circuit Ventures LLC (Johnson, Jay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 01/16 9:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Emerson Electric Co.. (am)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/16 8:45 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Circuit Ventures LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2020
2 2 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 01/09 2:02 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay)
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/09 9:03 AM
COMPLAINT Original Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13052078), filed by Circuit Ventures LLC.(Johnson, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Memo in Support Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit H
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/09 9:31 AM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
Related: [-]