Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:20-cv-00107
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2020
Re-opened:Feb 28, 2023
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Defendant
Antoine Caldwell
Defendant
Benjamin Ford
Defendant
Shawn Emmons
Defendant
Timothy C. Ward
Defendant
Tyrone Oliver
Intervenor
De'Kelvin Rafael Martin
Plaintiff
Michael Wade Nance

GPO Feb 13 2025
ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, this Court concludes that Plaintiff has failed to demonstrate that he is entitled to relief. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Doc. 154 is DENIED as moot because the Court did not rely on any of the challenged statements contained within the motion. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendants. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 2/13/2025. (gww)
GPO Apr 25 2025
ORDER denying 159 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/25/2025. (bgt)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
163 163 23 pgs order Order Mon 04/28 12:20 PM
ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, this Court concludes that Plaintiff has failed to demonstrate that he is entitled to relief. Plaintiff's154 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot because the Court did not rely on any of the challenged statements contained within the motion. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendants. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on April 28, 2025. (jkl) Modified on 4/28/2025 (jkl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 12:23 PM
NOTICE -157 Order has been updated to correct a typographical error on page 23. See163 Order. (jkl) Modified on 4/28/2025 (jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
162 162 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Alter Judgment Fri 04/25 2:59 PM
ORDER denying159 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/25/2025. (bgt)
Related: [-]