Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry R Wilhoit, Jr
Case #: 0:14-cv-00058
Nature of Suit423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157
Cause28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2014
Terminated:Apr 07, 2014
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 8:56 AM EST
In Re
Appalachian Fuels, LLC
Petitioner
Bingham Greenebaum Doll, LLP
Represented By
K. Gregory Haynes
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, Llp - Louisville
contact info
Robert J. Brown
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs Llp - Lexington
contact info
Daniel I. Waxman
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs Llp - Lexington
contact info
Respondent
Liquidating Trustee of Appalachian Fuels Creditors Trust, The
Represented By
Reda M. Hicks
Diamond Mccarthy Llp - Houston
contact info
Allan B. Diamond
Diamond Mccarthy Llp - New York
contact info
Benjamin R. Garry
Diamond Mccarthy Llp - Houston
contact info


Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2014
Clerk's Note: Prev. entry regarding case transferred to WDKY has been deleted and this entry is case has now been transferred and correctly assigned case number 3:14mc00011 (SMT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2014
Clerk's Note re3 : Case electronically transferred to Western District of Kentucky using CM/ECF. (TDA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2014
3 3 ORDER; before court upon the Motion for Withdrawal of Reference and Transfer of Venue; and the resp; and upon agreement of parties 1) Motion for withdrawal of reference and transfer of venue1 be sustained 2) reference to the Bankruptcy Court of Adv Proceeding No. 11-01003 is withdrawn in its entirety; effective as of date of this order, for all pretrial and trial proceedings 3) matter is TRANSFERRED to the USDC/WDKY.. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 4/7/14.(SMT)cc: COR, Bankruptcy Court
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2014
Conflict Check run. (SMT)
Related: [-]
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Bingham Greenebaum Doll, LLP MOTION to Change Venue by Bingham Greenebaum Doll, LLP (SMT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2014
2 2 RESPONSE to Motion re1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Bingham Greenebaum Doll, LLP MOTION to Change Venue by Bingham Greenebaum Doll, LLP filed by Liquidating Trustee of Appalachian Fuels Creditors Trust, The. (SMT)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Bingham Greenebaum Doll, LLP, MOTION to Transfer Venue by Bingham Greenebaum Doll, LLP(SMT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation of Record,
Att: 4 Case Assignment