Delaware District Court
Judge:Leonard P Stark
Case #: 1:20-cv-00037
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2020
Terminated:Mar 16, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Jul 11, 2020 6:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Bitonic Technology Labs, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Frederick Troupe Mickler, IV
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Plaintiff
DiscoverOrg Data, LLC
Represented By
Steven J. Fineman
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Alexandra M. Ewing
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 16, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/16 6:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DiscoverOrg Data, LLC as to Defendant Bitonic Technology Labs, Inc., d/b/a YellowMessenger (Fineman, Steven)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Civil Wed 03/18 9:13 AM
CASE CLOSED (ntl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2020
order SO ORDERED Thu 03/05 10:07 AM
SO ORDERED, re7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to March 13, 2020 filed by Bitonic Technology Labs, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/5/20. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
7 7 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 03/03 4:16 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to March 13, 2020 - filed by Bitonic Technology Labs, Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
order SO ORDERED Wed 02/19 9:52 AM
SO ORDERED, re6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to March 3, 2020 filed by Bitonic Technology Labs, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/19/20. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
6 6 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 02/18 2:39 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to March 3, 2020 - filed by Bitonic Technology Labs, Inc.. (Mickler, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
order SO ORDERED Tue 02/04 9:24 AM
SO ORDERED, re5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to February 18, 2020 filed by Bitonic Technology Labs, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/4/20. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
5 5 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 02/03 2:37 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to February 18, 2020 - filed by Bitonic Technology Labs, Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/15 12:10 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/14 4:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DiscoverOrg Data, LLC. Bitonic Technology Labs, Inc. served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020. (Ewing, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2020
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Mon 01/13 8:45 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent DiscoverOrg Holdings, LLC for Discoverorg Data LLC filed by Discoverorg Data LLC. (apk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Mon 01/13 8:40 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/13 8:39 AM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bitonic Technology Labs, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2822635.) - filed by Discoverorg Data LLC(apk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Summons Issued Mon 01/13 8:48 AM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Bitonic Technology Labs, Inc. on 1/13/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (apk)
Related: [-]