Giuliano v. Global Icons, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-10055
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-10055
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Kevin Gross |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50006 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Global Icons, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, Chapter 7 Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Wed 07/29 12:51 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Veghte, Sally) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 07/29 3:15 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50006 Closed (MB) |
||
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/02 1:10 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer the Complaint Order Signed on 7/2/2020. (RC) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Stipulation | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Thu 07/02 9:39 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Veghte, Sally) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Order and Stipulation | ||
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/26 10:17 AM
Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Through April 24, 2020 Order Signed on 3/26/2020. (RC) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Wed 03/25 4:40 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Veghte, Sally) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Stipulation
Fri 02/21 12:46 PM
Stipulation Between Alfred T. Giuliano and Global Icons, LLC Extending Time Through March 23, 2020 for Defendant Global Icons, LLC to Respond to Complaint . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Veghte, Sally) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
court
Case Reassigned
Thu 02/06 3:20 PM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge John T. Dorsey added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin Gross Terminated (SH) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Wed 01/22 3:44 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Global Icons, LLC. Tickle due by: 3/23/2020. (Veghte, Sally) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 01/10 1:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50006 KG) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9596031, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Fri 01/10 1:53 PM
Adversary case 20-50006 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers by Alfred Thomas Giuliano, Chapter 7 Trustee against Global Icons, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 4/9/2020. (Veghte, Sally) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 |