Minnesota District Court
Judge:David S Doty
Referred: Hildy Bowbeer
Case #: 0:20-cv-00171
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2020
Terminated:Apr 12, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jul 11, 2020 3:56 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
M.G. McGrath, Inc.
Represented By
David A Schooler
Nilan Johnson Lewis PA
contact info
Gregory A Bromen
Nilan Johnson Lewis PA
contact info
Cheryl Kozdrey
Saxe Doernberger & Vita, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey Vita
Saxe Doernberger & Vita, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pepe
Saxe Doernberger & Vita, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By
Paulette S Sarp
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Anthony Alton Remick
Hinshaw And Culbertson
contact info
Defendant
M.G. McGrath, Inc.
Represented By
David A Schooler
Nilan Johnson Lewis PA
contact info
Gregory A Bromen
Nilan Johnson Lewis PA
contact info
Cheryl Kozdrey
Saxe Doernberger & Vita, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey Vita
Saxe Doernberger & Vita, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pepe
Saxe Doernberger & Vita, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By
Paulette S Sarp
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Anthony Alton Remick
Hinshaw And Culbertson
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
AVRO Consult Engineering, P.C.
Terminated: 04/09/2020
Represented By
Douglas J McIntyre
Foley & Mansfield, Pllp
contact info
Thomas Priebe
Foley & Mansfield, Pllp
contact info
Defendant
Kraus-Anderson Construction Company
Terminated: 04/06/2020
Represented By
Janine M Loetscher
Bassford Remele
contact info
J Scott Andresen
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Defendant
Northland Concrete and Masonry, Inc.
Terminated: 03/05/2020


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 12, 2021
61 61 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/12 10:04 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 4/12/2021.(DLO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
60 60 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 04/08 3:42 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re59 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Broman, Stacy)
Related: [-]
59 59 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 04/08 3:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Zurich American Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Liberty Insurance Corporation and M.G. McGrath, Inc.. (Broman, Stacy)
Related: [-]