SAM Party of New York et al v. Cuomo et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John G Koeltl |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00323 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 12, 2020 6:08 AM EDT |
Amicus
Brennan Center for Justice At New York University School of Law
120 Broadway Suite 1750
New York, NY 10271 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert A. Brehm
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Douglas A. Kellner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Peter S. Kosinski
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andrew J. Spano
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Todd D. Valentine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SAM Party of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael J. Volpe
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Andrew Cuomo
Terminated: 05/12/2020
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John J. Flanagan
Terminated: 05/12/2020
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carl E. Heastie
Terminated: 05/12/2020
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Kolb
Terminated: 05/12/2020
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andrea Stewart-Cousins
Terminated: 05/12/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 12, 2022 | ||
142 | 142
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 04/12 1:15 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to139 Notice of Appeal, filed by SAM Party of New York, Michael J. Volpe. USCA Case Number 22-139. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered".. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 04/12/2022..(nd) |