Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12151

Alabama Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Bess M Parrish Creswell
Case #: 1:20-ap-01003
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2020
Terminated:Feb 18, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Better Day Loans
Post Office Box 6882
Santa Rosa, CA 95406
Plaintiff
Christopher M. Lee
111 East North Street
Columbia, AL 36319
Represented By
J. Kaz Espy
Espy, Metcalf & Espy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Thursday, February 20, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Service Fri 02/21 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/20/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Acknowledgment of Dismissal
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
7 7 court Acknowledgment of Dismissal Tue 02/18 1:24 PM
In accordance with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as made applicable by Rule 7041, Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, this serves as acknowledgment of the plaintiff's dismissal of this adversary proceeding without prejudice. This adversary proceeding will be closed. (Hagmaier, Tonya)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/18 3:10 PM
Adversary Case Closed (AP 20-01003 (Non-Image Entry). (EW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2020
6 6 notice Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 02/14 12:43 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by J. Kaz Espy on behalf of Christopher M. Lee Related [+]. (Espy, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Christopher M. Lee
Monday, January 20, 2020
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 01/20 12:20 PM
Summons Service Executed on Better Day Loans 1/20/2020 ; Kashia Band of Pomo Indians of Stewarts Point Rancheria; Dino Franklin, Jr., Tribal Chairman; and, Sabrina L. McKinney, Chapter 13 Trustee . Related [+]. (Espy, J.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Appendix Summons
Att: 2 Appendix Complaint
Att: 3 Appendix Complaint - Exhibit A
Att: 4 Appendix Complaint - Exhibit B
Thursday, January 16, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Service Fri 01/17 12:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/16/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 01/14 3:47 PM
Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff to be served on Defendant Better Day Loans Date Issued 1/14/2020, Answer Due 2/13/2020. Execution of Summons to be done by 1/21/2020. (JS)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/13 4:56 PM
Adversary case 20-01003 (72 (Injunctive relief - other)): Complaint against Better Day Loans. -NO FEE DUE- filed by J. Kaz Espy on behalf of Christopher M. Lee. (Espy, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letter Return Funds
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Letter Return Funds
Att: 3 Appendix AP Cover Sheet
Att: 4 Appendix Summons