PRL USA Holdings, Inc. v. VNDS Los Angeles et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Consuelo B Marshall |
Referred: | Patrick J Walsh |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-00374 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jan 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 09, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 12, 2020 4:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Brandon Nall
|
|
Defendant
VNDS Los Angeles
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
PRL USA Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brent H Blakely counsel for Plaintiff PRL USA Holdings, Inc.. Colby A. Meagle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff PRL USA Holdings, Inc. (Blakely, Brent) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Consistent with the Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Default Judgment, default judgment is entered against Defendants VNDS Los Angeles and Brandon Nall, jointly and severally, and in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $800,000.00, in statutory damages under 15 U.S.C. § 1117(c), plus prejudgment interest pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1117(b) at an interest rate of 4% per annum or 0.011% of the statutory damages amount per day between January 19, 2020 (the date of the pleadings were served) and the date of judgment. Related to: APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants VNDS LOS ANGELES AND BRANDON NALL14 . ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (shb) |
|
18 | 18
![]() ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT14 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court GRANTS the Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and IT IS ORDERED that default judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $800,000.00, in statutory damages under 15 U.S.C. § 1117(c), against Defendants VNDS Los Angeles and Brandon Nall, jointly and severally. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1117(b), that Plaintiff is awarded prejudgment interest based on the $800,000 statutory damages amount at aninterest rate of 4% per annum1 or 0.011% of the statutory damages amount per day between January 19, 2020 (the date of the pleadings were served) and the date ofjudgment, against Defendants VNDS Los Angeles and Brandon Nall, jointly andseverally. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants, its officers, agents, servants and employees and any persons in active concert or participation with them are permanently restrained and enjoined from infringing upon Plaintiffs federally registered trademarks, including but not limited the marks identified in Exhibit A attached hereto (the RALPH LAUREN Trademarks), either directly or contributorily in any manner, including: Manufacturing, importing, advertising, marketing, promoting, supplying, distributing, offering for sale, and/or selling products which bear the Plaintiffs RALPH LAUREN Trademarks, or any marks/designs identical, substantially similar, and/or confusingly similar thereto; IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for further details. Related to: APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants VNDS LOS ANGELES AND BRANDON NALL,14 . (shb) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, Motion Hearing,16(Zhai, Mark) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT14 held before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Following discussions with the parties, the Court hereby GRANTS the application. The Plaintiff shall provide anew proposed order by no later than November 20, 2020. Once that is done the order will issue. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (lom) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - NOTICE AND ORDER TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: On August 31, 2020, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. On October 14, 2020, Plaintiff filed an application for default. The Court having considered the Plaintiff's response and deems the response satisfactory and adequately addresses the Court's concerns. Accordingly, the Order to Show Cause is hereby vacated and discharged. Plaintiff is reminded that he is expected to comply with all rules and orders of the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants VNDS LOS ANGELES AND BRANDON NALL filed by Plaintiff PRL USA Holdings, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Meagle, Colby) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before OCTOBER 14, 2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently:Plaintiff's noticed motion for entry of default judgment pursuant to Rule 55b of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is plaintiff's responsibility to respond promptly to all Orders and to prosecute the action diligently, including filing proofs of service and stipulations extending time to respond. See order for further details. (shb) |
|
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to VNDS LOS ANGELES, an unknown business entity, BRANDON NALL, an individual (shb) |
|
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Brandon Nall, VNDS Los Angeles filed by Plaintiff PRL USA Holdings, Inc.. (Meagle, Colby) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff PRL USA Holdings, Inc., upon Defendant Brandon Nall served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brandon Nall in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blakely, Brent) |
|
9 | 9
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff PRL USA Holdings, Inc., upon Defendant VNDS Los Angeles served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brandon Nall, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blakely, Brent) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Brandon Nall, VNDS Los Angeles. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by PRL USA Holdings, Inc.. (Blakely, Brent) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff PRL USA Holdings, Inc., (Blakely, Brent) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff PRL USA Holdings, Inc.. (Blakely, Brent) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff PRL USA Holdings, Inc.. (Blakely, Brent) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25118361 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff PRL USA Holdings, Inc.. (Attorney Brent H Blakely added to party PRL USA Holdings, Inc.(pty:pla))(Blakely, Brent) |