Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:20-cv-00049
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2020
Terminated:Nov 03, 2020
Last checked: Monday Jul 13, 2020 4:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Shuart and Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Stacey C.S. Cerrone
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jamie L. Houston
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Lindsey H. Chopin
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
William Robinson Stukenberg
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Darnell Shuart
521 S. Massachusetts Avenue
Covington,, LA 70433
Represented By
Stacey C.S. Cerrone
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jamie L. Houston
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Lindsey H. Chopin
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
William Robinson Stukenberg
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Erin Kessler
Represented By
Aaron Charles de la Garza
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Lazar
Represented By
Aaron Charles de la Garza
contact info


Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Thursday, January 21, 2021
22 22 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/21 2:37 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
21 21 6 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 11/03 9:52 AM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's18 Agreed Motion for Approval of Settlement. ORDER CLOSING Case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/23 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Erin Kessler, Stephanie Lazar (de la Garza, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
19 19 motion Hearing Tue 09/15 12:07 PM
MOTION for Hearing by Erin Kessler, Stephanie Lazar.(de la Garza, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
18 18 motion Settlement Wed 07/29 2:12 PM
Agreed MOTION for Settlement Approval by Erin Kessler, Stephanie Lazar.(de la Garza, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 23, 2020
17 17 3 pgs order Order Staying Case Status Report Order Fri 07/24 8:23 AM
ORDER STAYING this action until August 24, 2020. ORDER that the parties submit their FLSA settlement as an exhibit to an agreed motion to approve the settlement agreement by August 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 07/22 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Erin Kessler, Stephanie Lazar (de la Garza, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
15 15 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Wed 07/15 12:31 PM
Order that the parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order using this Court's Agreed Scheduling Order form on or before July 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
14 14 4 pgs order Order Tue 06/23 9:53 PM
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
13 13 4 pgs order Order Fri 04/17 7:48 PM
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2020
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 04/13 12:00 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint by Shuart and Associates, Inc..(Houston, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 04/01 6:12 PM
Text Order MOOTING2 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, (Dkt. 10), Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, (Dkt. 2), is MOOT as it pertains to a now superseded pleading. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ld)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/30 12:32 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Erin Kessler, Stephanie Lazar, re2 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Shuart and Associates, Inc. (de la Garza, Aaron)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/30 12:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shuart and Associates, Inc., Darnell Shuart amending1 Complaint., filed by Erin Kessler, Stephanie Lazar.(de la Garza, Aaron)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Correction Mon 03/30 12:57 PM
Notice of Correction: re10 Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Section 5a(3) of the Western District's Administrative Policies and Procedures, civil pleadings that add parties are to be filed TRADITIONALLY rather than electronically. Please make note of this for future filings with this court. (lt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
9 9 4 pgs order Order Wed 03/25 7:54 PM
Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic (tada)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/18 12:47 PM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion for Lindsay H. Chopin to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shuart & Associates, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/18 12:46 PM
ORDER GRANTING5 Motion for Stacey C.S. Cerrone to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shuart & Associates, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/17 12:12 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Robinson Stukenberg Lindsey Chopin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13351582) by on behalf of Shuart and Associates, Inc..(Stukenberg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ATTACHMENT A,
Att: 2 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/17 12:08 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Robinson Stukenberg Stacey Cerrone ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13351455) by on behalf of Shuart and Associates, Inc..(Stukenberg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ATTACHMENT A,
Att: 2 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 03/17 11:48 AM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Shuart and Associates, Inc.. (Stukenberg, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/17 11:41 AM
SHUART AND ASSOCIATES, INCS ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT ANSWER to1 Complaint by Shuart and Associates, Inc..(Houston, Jamie)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Dismiss Tue 03/17 11:28 AM
MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) by Shuart and Associates, Inc.. (Stukenberg, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 5:56 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13083355). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Erin Kessler, Stephanie Lazar.(de la Garza, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/16 7:58 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Thu 01/16 7:59 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin. (dl)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Thu 01/16 7:59 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Erin Kessler, Stephanie Lazar. (dl)
Related: [-]