Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-00183
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2020
Terminated:Mar 15, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 14, 2020 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JERRY HARTSOCK
Represented By
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 15, 2021
2 2 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/15 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JERRY HARTSOCK (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/16 12:09 PM
COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against All Defendants, filed by JERRY HARTSOCK. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]