California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:20-cr-00120
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2020
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2020 11:26 PM PST
Defendant
Victor Manuel Sanchez (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Linda Alexandra McDonald
Federal Defenders Of San Diego Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Steven Lee
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jun 15 2020
JUDGMENT as to Victor Manuel Sanchez (1). Count(s) 1, Custody of BOP for Time Served, followed by 3 years supervised release. No fine. $100 penalty assessment order waived. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (aef)(jrd)

Docket last updated: 01/17/2020 12:34 AM PST
Monday, December 16, 2019
Arrest of Victor Manuel Sanchez (no document attached) (vyc) [2:19-mj-11889-RBM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Victor Manuel Sanchez. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 12/17/2019 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Preliminary Hearing set for 12/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Arraignment set for 1/14/2020 at 1:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro.(vyc) [2:19-mj-11889-RBM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Victor Manuel Sanchez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 12/17/2019. (ADI, jxv) [2:19-mj-11889-RBM]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Initial Appearance as to Victor Manuel Sanchez held on 12/17/2019. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Victor Manuel Sanchez. Bond set as to Victor Manuel Sanchez (1) No Bail. Preliminary Hearing set for 12/31/2019 at 10:00am in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth B. Montenegro. Arraignment set for 1/14/2020 at 1:30pm in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth B. Montenegro. Detention Hearing as to Victor Manuel Sanchez held on 12/17/2019. USA oral motion for detention; motion granted as to Victor Manuel Sanchez. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be submitted by AUSA. (Interpreter Ana Reyna). (CD# 12/17/2019 RBM 2:28-2:31). (Plaintiff Attorney Jessica Moreno AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jo Anne Tyrell). (aum) [2:19-mj-11889-RBM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Linda Alexandra McDonald appearing for Victor Manuel Sanchez (McDonald, Linda)Attorney Linda Alexandra McDonald added to party Victor Manuel Sanchez(pty:dft) (vxc). [2:19-mj-11889-RBM]
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Victor Manuel Sanchez (McDonald, Linda) (vxc). [2:19-mj-11889-RBM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2019
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Steven Lee appearing for USA. (Lee, Steven)Attorney Steven Lee added to party USA(pty:pla) (vxc). [2:19-mj-11889-RBM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2019
7 7 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Victor Manuel Sanchez. Preliminary Hearing set for 12/30/2019 at 1:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. On Court's own motion.(no document attached) (aum) [2:19-mj-11889-RBM]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2019
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Preliminary Hearing not held as to Victor Manuel Sanchez. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 1/14/2020 at 1:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (CD# 12/30/2019 RBM 2:35-2:35). (Plaintiff Attorney James Rotstein AUSA). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson FD). (aum) [2:19-mj-11889-RBM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
9 9 INFORMATION as to Victor Manuel Sanchez (1) count(s) 1. (aef)
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Victor Manuel Sanchez (1). (aef)
Related: [-]