Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-18706

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:20-ap-01014
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2020
Terminated:Jul 30, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Richard Joseph Karwacki
282 N. DeGaulle St.
Aurora, CO 80018
Represented By
Richard Joseph Karwacki
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Southall
Represented By
Phillip A. Parrott
Campbell Killin Brittan & Ray, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, July 30, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/30 7:33 AM
Adversary Case Number 20-1014 Closed. (jss)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/17 10:22 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Judgment for AP Case
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/17 10:22 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
31 31 order Judgment for AP Case Wed 07/15 12:39 PM
Judgment For Plaintiff, Timothy Southall Against Defendant, Richard Karwacki Related [+]. (jss)
Related: [-] 30 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
30 30 order Default Judgment Wed 07/15 12:36 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant, Richard R. Karwacki Related [+]. (jss)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Default Judgment
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 07/15 12:40 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 20-1014 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 7/29/2020. (jss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
29 29 misc Document/Discovery or Support Document Tue 07/14 11:25 AM
Supporting Document Filed by Phillip A. Parrott on behalf of Timothy Southall Related [+]. (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Default Judgment
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 26, 2020
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 06/26 10:20 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/26/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order to File
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
27 27 order File Wed 06/24 4:11 PM
Order to File Supplemental Affidavit Related [+]. Document due by 7/15/2020 for23 , (jss)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
26 26 misc Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Tue 06/23 11:51 AM
Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Phillip A. Parrott on behalf of Timothy Southall Related [+]. (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Default Judgment
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/23 11:46 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Phillip A. Parrott on behalf of Timothy Southall Related [+]. (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Default Judgment,24 9013-1.1 Notice
Thursday, May 21, 2020
24 24 notice 9013-1.1 Notice Thu 05/21 4:30 PM
9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Phillip A. Parrott on behalf of Timothy Southall Related [+]. 9013 Objections due by 6/11/2020 for23 , (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Default Judgment
23 23 motion Default Judgment Thu 05/21 4:29 PM
Second Motion for Default Judgment Against Richard Karwacki Filed by Phillip A. Parrott on behalf of Timothy Southall. (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Proposed/Unsigned Order)
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/06 10:24 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/06/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Virtual Clerks Entry of Default
Monday, May 04, 2020
21 21 order Virtual Clerks Entry of Default Mon 05/04 11:58 AM
Virtual Clerk's Entry of Default As To Defendant, Richard Karwacki Related [+]. (jss)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, May 01, 2020
20 20 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 05/01 4:42 PM
Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Phillip A. Parrott on behalf of Timothy Southall Related [+]. (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/01 10:35 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion for Alias Summons
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
18 18 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 03/31 4:30 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Richard Karwacki (Debtor) and Joshua Bekerman (Debtor's Attorney) on March 31, 2020 Filed by Phillip A. Parrott on behalf of Timothy Southall. (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
17 17 court Alias Summons Mon 03/30 4:32 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Richard Joseph Karwacki Answer Due 4/29/2020. (saa)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Alias Summons Mon 03/30 2:19 PM
Order Granting Motion For Alias Summons Related [+]. (jss)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Alias Summons
Friday, March 27, 2020
15 15 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 03/27 4:43 PM
Summons Issued on Richard Joseph Karwacki Answer Due 04/27/2020. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Alias Summons Fri 03/27 4:42 PM
Motion For Alias Summons Filed by Phillip A. Parrott on behalf of Timothy Southall. (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, March 26, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/26 10:28 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/26/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
12 12 order Default Judgment Tue 03/24 2:52 PM
Order Vacating Clerk's Entry of Default and Denying Motion For Default Judgment Related [+]. (jss)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment
Monday, March 23, 2020
11 11 motion Default Judgment Mon 03/23 2:03 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Richard Karwacki Filed by Phillip A. Parrott on behalf of Timothy Southall. (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order/Final Judgment
Thursday, March 12, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/12 10:29 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/12/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Virtual Clerks Entry of Default
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
9 9 order Virtual Clerks Entry of Default Tue 03/10 12:19 PM
Virtual Clerk's Entry of Default As To Defendant, Richard Karwacki Related [+]. (jss)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default
8 8 order Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 03/10 12:18 PM
This entry entered in error. Disregard following entry per request. Order Granting Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+]. (jss) Modified on 3/10/2020 (jss)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default
7 7 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 03/10 11:55 AM
Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Phillip A. Parrott on behalf of Timothy Southall Related [+]. (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/04 10:34 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order to Show Cause
Monday, March 02, 2020
5 5 order Show Cause Mon 03/02 11:11 AM
Order to Show Cause Related [+]. Show Cause Response due date 3/23/2020 for1 , (jss)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 01/21 4:56 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Richard Karwacki and Joshua A. Bekerman on January 21, 2020 Filed by Phillip A. Parrott on behalf of Timothy Southall. (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 01/21 1:05 PM
Summons Issued on Richard Joseph Karwacki Answer Due 02/20/2020. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 01/16 3:38 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-01014 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A28072976. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/16 3:34 PM
Adversary case 20-01014 Complaint by Timothy Southall against Richard Joseph Karwacki. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 05/15/2020 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Parrott, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Summons