Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:James D Peterson
Referred: Stephen L Crocker
Case #: 3:20-cv-00053
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2020
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 15, 2020 3:43 AM CDT
Cross Claimant
Dean Health Plan Inc.
Represented By
Jamie A. Stock-Retzloff
Dean Health Plan, Inc.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Eric Sauer
Represented By
Steven Todd Caya
Nowlan & Mouat, LLP
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
David Daly Conway
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Megan Renee Stelljes
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Dean Health Plan Inc.
Represented By
Jamie A. Stock-Retzloff
Dean Health Plan, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Erie Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Eric Sauer
Represented By
Steven Todd Caya
Nowlan & Mouat, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Brian J. Buenzow
Terminated: 02/12/2020


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, February 01, 2021
utility Terminate Civil Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) - public docket entry Mon 02/01 12:18 PM
Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jls)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
34 34 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/29 2:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
33 33 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 12/08 3:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer: Settlement Conference held on 12/8/2020, during which the parties reached a final settlement. [03:30] (jls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 11/05 2:07 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting30 Motion for Extension of Time. Dispositive Motions due 12/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/5/2020. (jls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
31 31 respm Declaration Wed 11/04 5:10 PM
Declaration of Angelica M. Santana filed by Defendant United States of America re:30 MOTION for Extension of Time (Stelljes, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - United States' 7-15-20 email to Dean requesting to schedule depositions,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Dean's automated response,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Dean's 7-19-20 response to United States,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Dean's 8-26-20 email resuming scheduling,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - United States' 9-16-20 email asking Dean for October dates,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - United States' 10-7-20 email to Dean regarding depositions,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Dean's 10-9-20 email providing potential deposition dates for Dr. Eccles Rotar,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - United States' Notice of Deposition of Dr. Eccles Rotar,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Dean's 11-3-20 email rescheduling deposition of Dr. Eccles Rotar,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - United States' Amended Notice of Deposition of Dr. Eccles Rotar,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Dean's 10-13-20 email providing potential deposition dates for Dr. Berentsen,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Steven Caya's 10-20-20 email notifying the United States of his unavailability,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - United States' Notice of Deposition of Dr. Berentsen
30 30 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/04 4:46 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant United States of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Stelljes, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 10/16 9:23 AM
Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer via Zoom video conference. The court will send invitations by email to counsel. (nln)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
29 29 misc Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Report Fri 09/25 3:51 PM
Supplemental Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Report by Plaintiff Eric Sauer (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Trial Transcript
28 28 misc Expert Witness Disclosures Fri 09/25 3:45 PM
Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosures by Plaintiff Eric Sauer (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Dr. Berentsen's Report
Thursday, September 03, 2020
27 27 misc Expert Witness Disclosures Thu 09/03 3:03 PM
Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosures by Plaintiff Eric Sauer (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Dr. Berentsen's Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit Dr. Eccles-Rotar's Report
Friday, August 21, 2020
26 26 trial Witness List Fri 08/21 3:02 PM
Witness List by Plaintiff Eric Sauer (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Dr. Pollack's August 18, 2020 Independent Medical Record Review Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit Dr. Pollack's CV,
Att: 3 Exhibit Dr. Pollack's Fee Schedule,
Att: 4 Exhibit Dr. Pollack's Depositions and Trials,
Att: 5 Exhibit Krenz Engineering; Robert Krenz Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit Robert Krenz CV,
Att: 7 Exhibit Robert Krenz Fee Schedule,
Att: 8 Exhibit Robert Krenz Depositions and Trials
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/28 11:22 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to20 Motion to Compel a Computation of Plaintiff's Future Medical Expenses . Telephone Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2020 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (jls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
25 25 respm Affidavit Tue 07/14 4:31 PM
Affidavit of Attorney Steven T. Caya filed by Plaintiff Eric Sauer re:20 Motion to Compel (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Narrative Report of Dr. Berentsen,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Notice of Claim,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Communication with Dr. Berentsen's Office regarding future medical expenses
24 24 respm Affidavit Tue 07/14 4:23 PM
Affidavit of Eric Sauer filed by Plaintiff Eric Sauer re:20 Motion to Compel (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Brief in Opposition Tue 07/14 4:21 PM
Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Eric Sauer re:20 Motion to Compel filed by United States of America (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
22 22 respm Declaration Mon 07/06 2:02 PM
Declaration of Megan R. Stelljes filed by Defendant United States of America re:20 Motion to Compel (Stelljes, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff Eric Sauer's Initial Disclosures,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - April 28, 2020 Email Exchange with Attorney Steven Caya,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - May 21-22 Email Exchange with Attorney Caya,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - June 5-11 Email Exchange with Attorney Caya and Attorney Emily Dykstra,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - June 17-24 Email Exchange with Attorney Caya,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - November 25, 2019 Medical Record,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - January 7, 2019 Letter from Dr. Berentsen
21 21 respm Brief in Support Mon 07/06 1:44 PM
Brief in Support of20 Motion to Compel by Defendant United States of America (Stelljes, Megan)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Compel Mon 07/06 1:43 PM
Motion to Compel a Computation of Plaitniff's Future Medical Expenses by Defendant United States of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 7/13/2020. (Stelljes, Megan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
19 19 order Pretrial Conference Order Thu 04/23 4:18 PM
Pretrial Conference Order -[LINK:Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson] attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 6/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due 11/9/2020. Settlement Letters due 3/12/2021. Motions in Limine due 3/19/2021. Response to Motion due 4/2/2021. Final Pretrial Submissions due 3/24/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 04:00 PM. Court Trial set for 4/21/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/23/2020. (jls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2020
minutes Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference Tue 04/21 1:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/21/2020 [:05] (cak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 04/14 2:45 PM
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
utility Set Pretrial or Status Conference Mon 03/16 1:21 PM
Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] (jls)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/13 4:15 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Dean Health Plan, Inc.'s Counter Claim by Defendant United States of America. (Stelljes, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/13 11:01 AM
ANSWER by Defendant United States of America. (Stelljes, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 13, 2020
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/13 3:31 PM
Notice by Plaintiff Eric Sauer re:12 Claim. Plaintiff's Answer to the Cross-Claim of Dean Health Plan, Inc. (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Wed 02/12 12:28 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Substitute Party and Dismiss Brian J. Buenzow from the case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/12/2020. (jls)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/07 8:39 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Dean Health Plan Inc. (Stock-Retzloff, Jamie)
Related: [-]
12 12 respoth Claim Fri 02/07 8:38 AM
Claim by Plaintiff Dean Health Plan Inc., Cross Claim against Eric Sauer. (Stock-Retzloff, Jamie) Modified on 2/7/2020. (lak)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/07 8:29 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jamie A. Stock-Retzloff for Plaintiff Dean Health Plan Inc. (Stock-Retzloff, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/04 1:23 PM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. United States of America served on 1/24/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Caya, Steven) Modified on 2/4/2020. (arw)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/04 1:22 PM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Brian J. Buenzow served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/04 1:21 PM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Dean Health Plan Inc. served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/04 1:19 PM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Erie Insurance Company served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/04 1:44 PM
Reset Answer Deadline: United States of America answer due 3/24/2020. (arw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/31 2:00 PM
Certification of Counsel by Defendant United States of America re:5 Motion to Substitute Party. Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2679(d)(2) . (Stelljes, Megan) Modified on 1/31/2020. (lak)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Substitute Party Fri 01/31 12:54 PM
Motion to Substitute Party by Defendant United States of America. Response due 2/7/2020. (Stelljes, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/22 11:41 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Eric Sauer. (Caya, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/21 10:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Brian J. Buenzow and United States of America. (jls)
Related: [-]
utility Add Judge for Shell Case Opening Tue 01/21 10:04 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
Related: [-]
utility Standard Attachments Sent Tue 01/21 10:05 AM
Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (jls)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 01/17 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2612950.), filed by Eric Sauer, (Caya, Steven) Modified on 1/17/2020. (lak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2020: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (lak)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/17 3:10 PM
Disregard. Complaint not attached. Deleted addresses of all parties. Modified on 1/17/2020. (lak)
Related: [-]