North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Conrad, Jr
Referred: David S Cayer
Case #: 3:20-cv-00038
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family & Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 15, 2020 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Represented By
Elizabeth Howe Pratt
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Raymond M. Ripple
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth Howe Pratt
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Raymond M. Ripple
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
CVS Rx Services, Inc.
1 CVS Drive
Woonsocket, RI 02895
Represented By
Elizabeth Howe Pratt
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Raymond M. Ripple
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
North Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By
Elizabeth Howe Pratt
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Raymond M. Ripple
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Greg Oglietti
Represented By
Bryan Lee Tyson
Marcellino & Tyson, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/17 3:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice - Joint by Greg Oglietti (Auckland, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/16 8:57 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Settlement Deadline 3/18/2021. (brl)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 15, 2021
27 27 adr Report of Mediation Mon 02/15 5:32 PM
REPORT of Mediation. Outcome of Mediation: Completely Settled. (Dunn, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 02/01 8:51 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER finding as moot 26 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines. Motions due by 2/19/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/1/2021. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 31, 2021
26 26 motion Extension of Time Amend/Correct Sun 01/31 8:51 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines for Dispositive Motions , Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct19 Order,, Set Pretrial Order Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, ( Responses due by 2/16/2021 ) by Greg Oglietti. (Auckland, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 12/21 1:37 PM
ORDER granting 20 Motion to Compel Discovery. Within fifteen days of this Order, Defendants shall serve complete, unredacted responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatory No. 4 and Requests for Documents Nos. 3, 7, 19 and 20.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/21/2020. (mek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/16 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Cleys on behalf of All Defendants (Cleys, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/11 10:17 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re20 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Greg Oglietti. (Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/04 4:34 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to Compel Discovery by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., North Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. Replies due by 12/11/2020(Ripple, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, December 03, 2020
21 21 adr Report of Mediation Thu 12/03 6:03 PM
REPORT of Mediation. Outcome of Mediation: Parties reached an Impasse. (Dunn, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
20 20 motion Compel Fri 11/20 8:17 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery by Greg Oglietti. Responses due by 12/4/2020 (Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A-Plaintiff's Termination Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex B-Defendants' Responses to Interrogatories,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex C-Defendants' Response to Document Requests,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex D-Letter from Defendants' Counsel,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex E-Declaration of Plaintiff,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex F-Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel
Thursday, October 01, 2020
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Pretrial Order Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 10/01 2:35 PM
ORDER granting 18 Joint Motion to Amend Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. Discovery due by 12/23/2020. Motions due by 2/5/2021. Mediation deadline set for 12/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/1/2020. (mek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
18 18 motion Amend/Correct Wed 09/30 3:42 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct14 Scheduling Order, by Greg Oglietti. Responses due by 10/14/2020 (Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
17 17 motion Extension of Time Mon 08/10 3:16 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Mediation Deadline by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., North Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. Responses due by 8/24/2020 (Pratt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 order Protective Order Mon 08/10 12:20 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 15 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/10/2020. (mek)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Protective Order Mon 08/10 10:09 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., North Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. Responses due by 8/24/2020 (Pratt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 08/10 3:51 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines. Mediation deadline set for 10/12/2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/10/2020. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
14 14 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/27 9:10 AM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Two (2) to Three (3) Days. Discovery due by 11/23/2020. Motions due by 1/7/2021. Mediation deadline set for 8/28/2020. Jury Trial set for 5/3/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr.. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 4/24/2020. (brl)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/27 9:20 AM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
13 13 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Tue 04/14 4:29 PM
Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Pratt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Tue 03/24 9:37 AM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 4/14/2020. (clc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2020
12 12 9 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/23 11:40 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., North Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C..(Ripple, Raymond)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/23 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond M. Ripple on behalf of All Defendants (Ripple, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/02 2:43 PM
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Raymond M. Ripple for CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., and North Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/2/2020. (mek)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Mon 03/02 11:05 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Raymond M. Ripple Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4407723. by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., North Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Pratt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Mon 03/02 2:45 PM
Notice to Raymond M. Ripple: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at[LINK:www.ncwd.uscourts.gov] . Deadline by 3/9/2020. (mek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 4:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Rx Services, Inc. (Pratt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 4:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation (Pratt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 4:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Pratt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 4:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by North Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Pratt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time Wed 02/26 4:13 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., North Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C..(Pratt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Howe Pratt on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., North Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Pratt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 02/26 4:22 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants' answer due March 23, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 02/26/2020. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 01/22 12:29 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 .(brj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
Friday, January 17, 2020
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/17 5:43 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4348835), filed by Greg Oglietti.(Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/21 7:49 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (brj)
Related: [-]