Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 2:20-cv-00297
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2020
Terminated:Aug 26, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 14, 2020 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
PROFFITO SOFTWARE, LLC
Defendant
EDWIN HENRY TAYLOR
Plaintiff
ANGELA MCCABE
Represented By
DAVID LEE BLACK
Riley Riper Hollin & Colagreco
contact info
GEORGE B. RANDOLPH
Riley Riper Hollin & Colagreco
contact info
Unrepresented Party
PROFFITO SOFTWARE, LLC
7224 AVALON BOULEVARD
ALPHARETTA, GA 30009
Unrepresented Party
EDWIN HENRY TAYLOR
11053 GREY OWL ROAD
ALPHARETTA, GA 30022


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 26, 2021
23 23 order Judgment Thu 08/26 10:06 AM
ORDER OF 8/25/21 THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS IN THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF $262,391.99. ETC. FURTHERED ORDERED THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT PROFFITO SOFTWARE,LLC, IN THE ADDITIONAL AMOUNT OF $18,235.00 IN PREJUDGMENT INTEREST. SIGNED BY JDUGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 8/25/21. 8/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
22 22 3 pgs order Order Thu 08/26 9:54 AM
ORDER OF8/25/21 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTFF ANGELA MCCABE'S MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (ECF NOS. 9,12), MEMORANDUM REGARDING LEGAL AUTHORITYFOR DAMAGES (ECF NO. 16), AND SUPPLEMENTALDOCUMENTS, AND FOLLOWING AN ON-THE-RECORD VIDEO HEARING,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT MCCABE'S REQUEST FOR DAMAGES IS GRANTED AS DESCRIBED HEREIN. A SEPARATE FINAL JUDGMENT WILL BE FILED IN FAVOR OF THE PLAINTFFS AND AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS. SIGNED BY JUDGE:JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 8/25/21. 8/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
21 21 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 12/16 11:54 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER Motion Hearing held on 12/16/20 re12 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Edwin Henry Taylor and Proffito Software, LLC filed by ANGELA MCCABE Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (dt, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
20 20 misc Affidavit Tue 12/08 2:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT re19 Order,, Set Hearings, by ANGELA MCCABE. (BLACK, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 11/13 11:12 AM
ORDER OF 11/13/20 THAT THE DEFAULT DAMAGES HEARING PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 18, 2020 IS CONTINUED TO DECEMBER 16, 2020 AT 10:00AM IN COURTROOM 3C IN ALLENTOWN. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/13/20. 11/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) Modified on 11/13/2020 (dt, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Tue 11/10 1:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Frank James re: served Court's Order Not yet found upon unserved (BLACK, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 10/20 10:15 AM
ORDER OF 10/19/20 THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A HEARING FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING DAMAGES ON NOVEMBER 18, 2020 AT 10:00AM IN COURTROOM 3C, EDWARD N. CAHN FEDERAL BUILDING IN ALLENTOWN. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 10/19/20. 10/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
16 16 6 pgs respm Memorandum Mon 09/14 12:07 PM
Memorandum regarding Legal Authority for Damages Sought by Plaintiff re12 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Edwin Henry Taylor and Proffito Software, LLC filed by ANGELA MCCABE.(RANDOLPH, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
15 15 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/02 4:49 PM
ORDER OF 9/2/20 THAT THE PORTION OF THIS COURT'S AUGUST 28, 2020 ORDER (ECF NO. 13) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE IS HEREBY VACATED; AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONFOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED AND JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OR PLAINTFF, ANGELA MCCABE AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS EDWIN HENRY TAYLOR AND PROFFITO SOFTWARE, LLC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 9/2/20. 9/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) Modified on 9/2/2020 (dt, )
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Statement Wed 09/02 11:08 AM
Statement Memo regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction by ANGELA MCCABE.(RANDOLPH, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, August 28, 2020
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 08/28 3:17 PM
ORDER OF 8/28/20 THAT THE MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT (ECF NOS. 9 AND 12) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ETC. PLAINTFF SHALL FILE ON OR BEORE SEPTEMBER 11, 2020 AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM ONT TO EXCEED THREE PAGES WHYTHIS COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS THIS CASE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M.GALLAGHER ON8/28/20. 8/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
12 12 motion Default Judgment Thu 06/25 2:38 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Edwin Henry Taylor and Proffito Software, LLC filed by ANGELA MCCABE.Declarations of Plaintiff, of Plaintiff's Counsel, Certificate of Service.(RANDOLPH, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Request for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 08, 2020
11 11 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/08 10:27 AM
ORDER THAT ON OR BEFORE 6/26/20, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL PROVIDE PROOF OF DAMAGES FROM WHICH THIS COURT CAN ASSESS DAMAGES AND SHALL INDICATE WHETHER HE BELIEVES A HEARING IS NECESSARY; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 6/8/20. 6/8/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/08 9:54 AM
ORDER OF 6/5/20 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ECF NO 9, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: ON OR BEFORE JUNE 26, 2020 COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL PROVIDE PROOF OF DAMAGES FROM WHICH THIS COURT CAN ASSESS DAMAGES AND SHALL INDICATE WHETHER HE BELIEVES A HEARING IS NECESSARY. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 6/5/20. 6/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt, )(copies not mailed to unrep) Modified on 6/8/2020 (dt, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
9 9 motion Default Judgment Tue 03/10 2:24 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Taylor and Proffito Software, LLC filed by ANGELA MCCABE.Certificate of Service.(RANDOLPH, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 05, 2020
8 8 misc Request for Default Judgment Thu 03/05 9:39 AM
Request for Default by ANGELA MCCABE against PROFFITO SOFTWARE, LLC, EDWIN HENRY TAYLOR.(RANDOLPH, GEORGE) Modified on 3/5/2020 (nd, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 03/05 2:00 PM
DEFAULT BY PROFFITO SOFTWARE, LLC, EDWIN HENRY TAYLOR FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (jl, )
Related: [-]
misc Default Entered Thu 03/05 2:00 PM
Default Entered (jl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
misc Returned Mail Tue 03/03 2:34 PM
Copy of Order/Notice dated 2/19/20 (Document # 6) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to PROFFITO SOFTWARE, LLC for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (jl, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 02/26 9:40 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY TO HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS,. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 02/26/2020. 02/26/20230 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
6 6 misc Letter Wed 02/19 3:49 PM
AMENDED Letter dated 2/19/20 FROM ULRIKE HEVENER TO DAVID LEE BLACK RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC. (jl, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Letter Wed 02/19 3:02 PM
Letter dated 2/19/20 FROM ULRIKE HEVENER TO DAVID BLACK RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC. (jl, ) (Filed in error; clerk will re-file) Modified on 2/19/2020 (nd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/29 10:22 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Frank James re: served Complaint and Summons upon Edwin H. Taylor and Proffito Software, LLC by personal service on 01/24/2020 & 01/27/2020 (RANDOLPH, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE B. RANDOLPH on behalf of ANGELA MCCABE (bw, )
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. BLACK on behalf of ANGELA MCCABE (bw, ) Modified on 1/17/2020 (fb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/17 8:57 AM
COMPLAINT against PROFFITO SOFTWARE, LLC, EDWIN HENRY TAYLOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE209921.), filed by ANGELA MCCABE.(bw, )
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 9:10 AM
2 Summons Issued as to PROFFITO SOFTWARE, LLC, EDWIN HENRY TAYLOR. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 1/17/20 (bw, )
Related: [-]