California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:96-cr-00413
Case Filed:Feb 27, 1996
Terminated:Aug 06, 2014
Defendant
Alonso Elenes-Higuera
Defendant
Arsenio Felix-Rubio
Defendant
Cecilio Acosta-Acosta
Defendant
Cristobal Sarmiento Palazuelos
Defendant
Domingo Hernan Ojeda-Lopez
Defendant
Manuel Elenes-Higuera
Defendant
Martin Felix
Defendant
Minguin
Defendant
Secundino Elenes-Higuera
Defendant
Tony Gutierrez
Plaintiff
United States of America

GPO Jul 13 2012
ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL in Criminal Case as to Secundino Elenes-Higuera (2), Alonso Elenes-Higuera (3), Manuel Elenes-Higuera (4), Cristobal Sarmiento Palazuelos (8). It is hereby ordered that the Indictment be dismissed without prejudice, and the Arrest Warrants be recalled. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/13/2012. (Abstracts issued to USM) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (jrl).ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL in Criminal Case as to Secundino Elenes-Higuera (2), Alonso Elenes-Higuera (3), Manuel Elenes-Higuera (4), Cristobal Sarmiento Palazuelos (8). It is hereby ordered that the Indictment be dismissed without prejudice, and the Arrest Warrants be recalled. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/13/2012. (Abstracts issued to USM) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (jrl).ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL in Criminal Case as to Secundino Elenes-Higuera (2), Alonso Elenes-Higuera (3), Manuel Elenes-Higuera (4), Cristobal Sarmiento Palazuelos (8). It is hereby ordered that the Indictment be dismissed without prejudice, and the Arrest Warrants be recalled. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/13/2012. (Abstracts issued to USM) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (jrl).ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL in Criminal Case as to Secundino Elenes-Higuera (2), Alonso Elenes-Higuera (3), Manuel Elenes-Higuera (4), Cristobal Sarmiento Palazuelos (8). It is hereby ordered that the Indictment be dismissed without prejudice, and the Arrest Warrants be recalled. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/13/2012. (Abstracts issued to USM) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (jrl).
GPO Aug 06 2014
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL in Criminal Case as to Tony Gutierrez (7). Count(s) 11, 29, Dismissed without prejudice. Arrest Warrant recalled. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/6/2014. (jao)

Docket last updated: 02/15/2022 2:23 PM PST

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.