Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-00686
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2020
Terminated:Feb 06, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Jul 18, 2020 6:35 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ADAM REYES
Represented By
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 06, 2020
2 2 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/07 9:13 AM
ORDER - The Clerk is directed to administratively close the second-filed case, Case No. 3:20cv686 In the future, all pleadings and papers must be filed on the docket for the first-filed case, Case No. 3:20cv512 only. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the docket for each of the above-captioned cases. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/6/2020. (djb) (filing fee waived)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/20 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against All Defendants, filed by ADAM REYES. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]