Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-00698
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2020
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 18, 2020 7:18 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ROBERT YOUNGSON
Represented By
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Thursday, July 28, 2022
2 2 13 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 07/29 2:32 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a Court order. Any motion to reopen must be filed on the individual docket for a plaintiff's case only by August 25, 2022. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/20 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against All Defendants, filed by ROBERT YOUNGSON. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]