Miller v. A.J. Facts Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50017 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 14, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
A.J. Facts Inc.
110 West 34th Street 7th Floor
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/14 12:48 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case # 20-50017 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 04/14 3:22 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50017 Closed (SS) |
||
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 03/23 10:10 AM
Notice of Settlement Sixth Notice of Settlement of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Settlement Procedures Order Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Fri 03/12 4:18 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 05/11/2021. (Felger Esq., Mark) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Mediation - Notice
Wed 02/10 12:55 PM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for March 11, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Sunday, December 13, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 12/14 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/13/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Fri 12/11 2:56 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Mark Felger is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Signed on 12/11/2020. (MD) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Fri 12/11 10:19 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 09/29 3:57 PM
Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Production and Interrogatories Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 09/02 4:16 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions Filed by A.J. Facts Inc. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 08/24 8:23 AM
Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Admissions Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Service
Thu 06/25 1:14 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Discovery Requests Filed by A.J. Facts Inc. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/22 7:25 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 05/27 1:26 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Filed by A.J. Facts Inc. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 04/27 11:13 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by A.J. Facts Inc.. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/27 11:12 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by A.J. Facts Inc. Mediation due date: 08/25/2020.(Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 2:39 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 12:54 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 12:50 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant A.J. Facts Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50017 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 01/21 11:04 AM
Adversary case 20-50017 Complaint by George L. Miller against A.J. Facts Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |