Miller v. Achim Importing Company Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50022 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Achim Importing Company Inc.
58 Second Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11215 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 02/16 10:19 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50022 Closed (MD) |
||
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 02/11 5:48 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50022 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Tue 12/22 11:07 AM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 02/22/2021. (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 12/15 12:48 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Mediation - Notice
Tue 12/15 8:16 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for January 6, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Sunday, December 13, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 12/14 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/13/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Fri 12/11 4:37 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Mediation Report due by 6/11/2021. Signed on 12/11/2020. (FMo) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Fri 12/11 10:21 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 09/23 2:02 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Achim Importing Company Inc. Mediation due date: 01/21/2021. (Weaver, John) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Tue 08/25 7:49 AM
Stipulation for Extension of Time Between George L. Miller and Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 2:39 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 12:54 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 12:55 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Achim Importing Company Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50022 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 01/21 11:17 AM
Adversary case 20-50022 Complaint by George L. Miller against Achim Importing Company Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |