Miller v. ADP, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50024 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ADP, LLC
One ADP Boulevard
Roseland, NJ 07068 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/13 10:28 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50024 Closed (JS) |
||
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case 20-50024 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant ADP, LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50024 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50024 Complaint by George L. Miller against ADP, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |