Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50026
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:Jan 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alba Wheels Up International Inc.
One East Lincoln Avenue
Valley Stream, NY 11580
Represented By
Alba Wheels Up International Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, January 29, 2021
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/29 11:21 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50026 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/29 2:27 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50026 Closed (SS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
15 15 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Tue 12/08 7:31 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 02/8/2021. (Felger Esq., Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
14 14 notice Mediation - Notice Mon 09/21 3:21 PM
Notice of Mediation to be held on November 5, 2020 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, August 14, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/15 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/14/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
12 12 court VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Wed 08/12 1:13 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Mark Felger is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 8/12/2020. (MB)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
11 11 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Tue 08/11 10:31 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Service Wed 05/27 1:27 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Filed by Alba Wheels Up International Inc. (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
9 9 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 04/27 11:50 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Alba Wheels Up International Inc.. (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/27 11:49 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Alba Wheels Up International Inc. Mediation due date: 08/25/2020.(Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 2:39 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 4 4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 12:54 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 1:00 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Alba Wheels Up International Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50026 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 01/21 11:57 AM
Adversary case 20-50026 Complaint by George L. Miller against Alba Wheels Up International Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives