Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50034
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:May 25, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fizzy Baby Limited Liability Company
27 Eighth Street
Passaic, NJ 07055
Represented By
Fizzy Baby Limited Liability Company
contact info
Defendant
Myletex International Inc.
27 Eighth Street
Passaic, NJ 07055
Represented By
Myletex International Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/25 10:53 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50034 Closed (SS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/14 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/13/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28
Monday, May 10, 2021
29 29 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/10 2:23 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Consent Judgment and Entry of Order for Judgment Related [+] Order Signed on 5/10/2021. (LJH)
Related: [-] 27
Att: 1 Exhibit A
28 28 order Judgment Mon 05/10 1:45 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Consent Judgment and Entry of Order for Judgment Related [+] Tickle due by: 5/24/2021. Signed on 5/10/2021. (LJH)
Related: [-] 27
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, May 07, 2021
27 27 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 05/07 3:59 PM
Joint Certification of Counsel Requesting Approval of Stipulation for Consent Judgment and Entry of Order for Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, May 03, 2021
26 26 notice Dismissal - Notice Mon 05/03 2:32 PM
Notice of Dismissal SOLEY as to Defendant Myletex International Inc. Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
25 25 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Thu 04/08 4:18 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
24 24 mediation Mediation Status Report Fri 04/02 12:28 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
23 23 notice Withdrawal - Notice Wed 02/17 6:08 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Mediator's Certificate of Completion Related [+] Filed by Ian Connor Bifferato (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-] 22
Monday, February 15, 2021
22 22 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Mon 02/15 4:37 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
21 21 mediation Mediation Status Report Wed 02/03 1:57 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/17 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/16/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
19 19 notice Notice of Service Tue 12/15 12:49 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Mediation - Notice Tue 12/15 8:18 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for January 15, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, December 14, 2020
17 17 court VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Mon 12/14 3:12 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 6/14/2021. Signed on 12/14/2020. (FMo)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, December 11, 2020
16 16 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Fri 12/11 10:25 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
15 15 mediation Mediation Status Report Thu 12/03 3:34 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
14 14 motion Stipulation Mon 10/05 12:50 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Fizzy Baby Limited Liability Company; and Myletex International Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
13 13 notice Mediation - Notice Thu 09/24 8:20 AM
Notice of Mediation Scheduled on November 4, 2020, Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 19, 2020
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/12 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/11/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, March 09, 2020
10 10 order Dismiss Case Mon 03/09 9:48 AM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and to Grant Further Relief, if Necessary Related [+] Order Signed on 3/9/2020. Tickle due by: 3/23/2020. (LJH)
Related: [-] 4 ,9
Friday, March 06, 2020
9 9 motion Strike - Motion Fri 03/06 11:11 AM
Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and to Grant Further Relief, if Necessary Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/20/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 4 4
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
8 8 answer Response Fri 03/06 11:05 AM
Response to Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Fizzy Baby Limited Liability Company Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 4
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 27, 2020
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
6 6 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
5 5 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 1:25 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
4 4 motion Dismiss Case - Motion Thu 02/20 10:15 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Fizzy Baby Limited Liability Company, Myletex International Inc. (JS) Modified on 2/20/2020 (JS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 3:23 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Fizzy Baby Limited Liability Company, Myletex International Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50034 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 01/21 12:19 PM
Adversary case 20-50034 Complaint by George L. Miller against Fizzy Baby Limited Liability Company, Myletex International Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives