Miller v. Angel Body Import Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50044 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Angel Body Import Inc.
1365 East 16th Street
Los Angeles, CA 90021 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 12/01 10:44 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50044 Closed (MB) |
||
Sunday, November 01, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Default Judgment against defendant Angel Body Import Inc. Tickle due by: 11/13/2020. Signed on 10/30/2020. (JS) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default against defendant Angel Body Import Inc. Signed on 10/30/2020. (JS) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Angel Body Import Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50044 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50044 Complaint by George L. Miller against Angel Body Import Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |