Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50053
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:Sep 17, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
G & S Off Price Inc.
2120 East 52nd Street
Vernon, CA 90058
Represented By
G & S Off Price Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, September 17, 2020
9 9 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 09/17 12:18 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/17 2:35 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50053 Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of Service Mon 06/22 7:31 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures. Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) Modified on 6/22/2020 (BA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 1:25 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 3:28 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant G & S Off Price Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50053 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 01/21 12:56 PM
Adversary case 20-50053 Complaint by George L. Miller against G & S Off Price Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives