Miller v. Gabbiano Luggage Inc
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50054 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gabbiano Luggage Inc
628 South Hambledon Avenue
City of Industry, CA 91744 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 03/26 2:05 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50054 Closed (MB) |
||
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Wed 03/25 11:15 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50054 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
9 | 9
notice
Withdrawal of Document - Notice
Wed 03/25 11:13 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Tue 03/17 4:40 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50054 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 1:25 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 3:29 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Gabbiano Luggage Inc. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50054 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 01/21 12:59 PM
Adversary case 20-50054 Complaint by George L. Miller against Gabbiano Luggage Inc. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |