Miller v. Aron's Manufacturing Corp.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50059 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Aron's Manufacturing Corp.
460 Troutman Street
Brooklyn, NY 11237 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Satisfaction of Judgment
Tue 01/19 1:15 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 12/01 11:38 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50059 Closed (MB) |
||
Sunday, November 15, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 11/16 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/15/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, November 14, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 11/15 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/14/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest
Fri 11/13 1:51 PM
Default Judgment against defendant Aron's Manufacturing Corp. Tickle due by: 11/30/2020. Signed on 11/13/2020. (JS) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 11/12 9:39 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Aron's Manufacturing Corp. Signed on 11/12/2020. (MB) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv)
Tue 11/10 1:17 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgement By Default | ||
8 | 8
motion
Request for Entry of Default (Adv)
Tue 11/10 12:36 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 2:51 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 12:54 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 1:23 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Aron's Manufacturing Corp.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50059 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 01/21 1:13 PM
Adversary case 20-50059 Complaint by George L. Miller against Aron's Manufacturing Corp.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |