Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50061
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:Nov 18, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Artistic Linen Inc.
319 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Artistic Linen Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/18 2:43 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50061 Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/17 4:15 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50061 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
13 13 notice Mediation - Notice Mon 09/21 3:49 PM
Notice of Mediation to be held on October 23, 2020 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, August 14, 2020
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/15 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/14/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
11 11 court VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Wed 08/12 2:06 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Martin Weis is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 8/12/2020. (MB)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
10 10 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Tue 08/11 10:33 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/29 3:47 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Artistic Linen Inc. Mediation due date: 09/28/2020. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
8 8 motion Stipulation Thu 05/07 7:53 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Artistic Linen Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 2:51 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 12:54 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 1:24 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Artistic Linen Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50061 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 01/21 1:15 PM
Adversary case 20-50061 Complaint by George L. Miller against Artistic Linen Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives